EP2392141 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ENCODING AN IMAGE USING A PREDICTION MASK DECODING METHOD AND DEVICE AND CORRESPONDING SIGNALS AND COMPUTER PROGRAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | [2013/39] |
Former [2011/49] | For all designated states France Telecom 6 place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMONOU, Isabelle Rue du Réage, 12 35510 Cesson Sevigne / FR | 02 /
MOINARD, Matthieu Vault Martin F-35510 Cesson Sevigne / FR | 03 /
CAMMAS, Nathalie Le Grand Aunay F-35490 Sens De Bretagne / FR | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Guy, Marion Cabinet Vidon Technopôle Atalante 16B rue de Jouanet 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10707587.1 | 26.01.2010 | WO2010FR50114 | Priority number, date | FR20090050511 | 28.01.2009 Original published format: FR 0950511 | [2011/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010086544 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2392141 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/34, H04N7/50 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
H04N19/192 (EP,US);
H04N19/11 (EP,US);
H04N19/129 (EP,US);
H04N19/14 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/182 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM CODIEREN EINES BILDES UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES PRÄDIKTIONSMASKEN-DECODIERUNGSVERFAHRENS UND EINRICHTUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDE SIGNALE UND COMPUTERPROGRAMME | [2011/49] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ENCODING AN IMAGE USING A PREDICTION MASK DECODING METHOD AND DEVICE AND CORRESPONDING SIGNALS AND COMPUTER PROGRAMS | [2011/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE D'UNE IMAGE UTILISANT UN MASQUE DE PREDICTION, PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DECODAGE, SIGNAL ET PROGRAMMES D'ORDINATEUR CORRESPONDANTS | [2012/01] |
Former [2011/49] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE D'UNE IMAGE UTILISANT UN MASQUE DE PREDICTION, PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DECODAGE, SIGNAL ET PROGRAMMES D'ORDINATEUR CORRESPONDANTS | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 13.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 11.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/06] | 20.09.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5767909 (JUNG HAE-MOOK [KR]) [A] 4 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 25 ** column 3, lines 30-40 *; | [A]US2006067399 (ZHANG ZHI-MING [KR]) [A] 1-12 * figures 4,8,12,14 * * paragraphs [0023] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0064] - [0069] * * paragraphs [0104] - [0119] *; | [A]US2007041450 (KIM SO-YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 7,8 * * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] * * paragraphs [0016] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0036] - [0047] * * paragraphs [0059] - [0068] *; | [A]EP1956847 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0018] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0069] - [0073] * * paragraphs [0081] - [0100] * * paragraphs [0109] - [0118] * * figures 3-5,7,10,11,15 *; | [Y]EP1976298 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7,9-12 * paragraphs [0002] - [0062] * * figures 6-14 *; | [X]US2009003443 (GUO YI [CN], et al) [X] 1-12 * figures 7-9 * * paragraphs [0003] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] * * paragraphs [0036] - [0053] *; | [XI] - SUGIMOTO K ET AL, "Inter frame coding with template matching spatio-temporal prediction", IMAGE PROCESSING, 2004. ICIP '04. 2004 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SINGAPORE 24-27 OCT. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE LNKD- DOI:10.1109/ICIP.2004.1418791, (20041024), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-8554-2, pages 465 - 468, XP010784855 [X] 1,2,4-12 * pages 465-467, sections 1-2 * * page 467, section 3, premier paragraphe * [I] 3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2004.1418791 | [XY] - THIOW KENG TAN ET AL, "Intra Prediction by Template Matching", IMAGE PROCESSING, 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20061001), ISBN 978-1-4244-0480-3, pages 1693 - 1696, XP031048981 [X] 8 * page 1693, parties 1-2.1 * * page 1694, partie 3.2 * [Y] 1-7,9-12 | [XA] - JIHENG YANG ET AL, "A Block-Matching Based Intra Frame Prediction for H.264/AVC", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, (20060701), ISBN 978-1-4244-0366-0, pages 705 - 708, XP031032933 [X] 8 * pages 705-706, parties 1-2.2 * * figures 2,3 * [A] 1-7,9-12 | [A] - YONGJUN WU ET AL, "Directional spatial I-blocks for the MC-EZBC video coder", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, (20040517), vol. 3, ISBN 978-0-7803-8484-2, pages 129 - 132, XP010718143 [A] 1-12 * page 130, parties 2.1-2.3 * | [A] - TAICHIRO SHIODERA ET AL, "Block Based Extra/Inter-Polating Prediction for Intra Coding", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (20070901), ISBN 978-1-4244-1436-9, pages VI - 445, XP031158358 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * pages 445-447, parties 1-3.2 * * figures 1-3 * |