EP2382273 - PRODUCTION OF HIGH MODULUS COATED MATERIAL AND BITUMINOUS CONCRETE (EME AND BBME) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COLAS 7, Place René Clair 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DURAND, Graziella 14 rue Diderot F-78460 Chevreuse / FR | 02 /
GUEIT, Carole 9 place Germaine Tailleferre F-78180 Montigny Le Bretonneux / FR | 03 /
DELCROIX, Thierry 71 rue des Robinettes F-95600 Eaubonne / FR | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Chauvin, Vincent, et al Cabinet Harle et Phelip 14/16 rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Chauvin, Vincent, et al Cabinet Harle et Phelip 14/16 rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10707611.9 | 28.01.2010 | WO2010FR50138 | Priority number, date | FR20090050549 | 29.01.2009 Original published format: FR 0950549 | [2011/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010086561 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2382273 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00, C08L23/00, C08L93/00, C09D195/00, C09D123/00, C09D193/00, E01C7/18 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
C08L95/00 (EP);
C09D195/00 (EP);
E01C7/265 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/26 (EP);
C08L95/00, C08L91/06 (EP);
C08L95/00, C08L93/04 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHMODULIGEM BESCHICHTETEM MATERIAL UND BITUMINÖSEM BETON (EME UND BBME) | [2011/45] | English: | PRODUCTION OF HIGH MODULUS COATED MATERIAL AND BITUMINOUS CONCRETE (EME AND BBME) | [2011/44] | French: | OBTENTION D'ENROBE ET DE BETON BITUMINEUX A MODULE ELEVE (EME ET BBME) | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/44] | HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHMODULIGEM BESCHICHTETEM MATERIAL UND BITUMIN?SEM BETON (EME UND BBME) | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 02.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 29.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1310262 (INT INDUSTRIEBEVORDERING NV, et al) [X] 1,8-10 * page 3; table 1 *; | [X]DE2248603 (FRITZ MUELLER KG) [X] 1,8-10 * page 2, lines 27-35 *; | [X]EP1792945 (CARL UNGEWITTER TRINIDAD LAKE [DE], et al) [X] 1-10* paragraphs [0021] - [0027]; table 1 *; | [X] - AMERICAN GILSONITE COMPANY, "GILSONITE INFORMATION BULLETIN", (2001), URL: http://www.americangilsonite.com/pdf/asphalt_mix.pdf, (20090828), XP002543373 [X] 1-10 * pages 1-5; figure 1 * | [X] - SASOL WAX GMBH, "SASOBIT, PRODUCT INFORMATION 124", (20040422), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.sasolwax.com/data/sasolwax_/Bitumen%20Modification/Sasobit%20since%201997.pdf, (20090828), XP002543374 [X] 1-10 * paragraph [02.2] * | [X] - LUCOBIT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, "Lucobit 1210A-Produktdatenblatt", INTERNET CITATION, URL: http://www.lucobit.de/icoaster/files/pdb1210a_d.pdf, (20070221), XP002421395 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * |