EP2414058 - VIDEO GAME CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beamz Interactive, Inc. 16039 North 82nd Street Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIOPELLE, Gerald, Henry 8693 E. Via Del Arbor Scottsdale AZ 85258 / US | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Hocking, Adrian Niall, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Hocking, Adrian Niall, et al Albright Patents Eagle Tower Montpellier Drive GB-Cheltenham, Gloucester GL50 1TA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10707700.0 | 17.02.2010 | WO2010US00453 | Priority number, date | US20090208012P | 19.02.2009 Original published format: US 208012 P | US20090381645 | 13.03.2009 Original published format: US 381645 | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010096163 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2414058 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/06 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
G10H1/368 (EP,US);
A63F13/54 (EP,US);
G10H1/34 (EP,US);
G10H3/146 (EP);
A63F2300/1012 (EP);
A63F2300/1062 (EP);
A63F2300/1087 (EP);
A63F2300/8047 (EP);
G10H2220/135 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Title | German: | VIDEOSPIELSTEUERUNG | [2012/06] | English: | VIDEO GAME CONTROLLER | [2012/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE JEU VIDÉO | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 20.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/09] | 29.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/09] | 16.10.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5442168 (GURNER ASAF [IL], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 10 * [I] 4-27; | [XI]US2002160823 (WATABE HAJIME [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0212] * [I] 4-27; | [A]US5475214 (DEFRANCO VINCENT [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * figure 1 * | by applicant | US5081896 | US3749810 | US5045687 | US5017770 |