Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011095185 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP00766 | 08.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012297947 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP00766 | 08.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2533952 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2014 | B1 | EP2533952 | 19.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP00766 | 08.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2456874T | 23.04.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP00766 | 08.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2533952T | 31.07.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP00766 | 08.02.2010 | EP10707815 | 08.02.2010 |