EP2403734 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE MOVEMENT CAPABILITY AND/OR A CLOSURE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2012/28] |
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VUJASINOVIC, Mirko Himmelberg 22 38446 Wolfsburg / DE | 02 /
ZAWADE, Torsten Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 12 31228 Peine / DE | [2018/15] |
Former [2012/02] | 01 /
VUJASINOVIC, Mirko Himmelberg 22 38446 Wolfsburg / DE | ||
02 /
ZAWADE, Torsten Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 12 31228Peine / DE | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [2018/15] |
Former [2012/02] | Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 10708115.0 | 23.02.2010 | [2018/15] | WO2010EP01216 | Priority number, date | DE20091011088 | 03.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009011088 | [2012/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010099904 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2403734 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2403734 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60K28/00, B60L11/18 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
B60K28/10 (EP,KR,US);
B60L53/16 (EP,KR,US);
E05B81/54 (KR);
B60L2240/80 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2250/24 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2250/26 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2510/244 (KR);
Y02T10/62 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER FAHRZEUGBEWEGUNGSMÖGLICHKEIT UND/ODER EINER VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG | [2012/02] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE MOVEMENT CAPABILITY AND/OR A CLOSURE DEVICE | [2012/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UNE POSSIBILITÉ DE MOUVEMENT D'UN VÉHICULE ET/OU D'UN DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE | [2012/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 17.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2010 | CY | 11.04.2018 | CZ | 11.04.2018 | DK | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | ES | 11.04.2018 | FI | 11.04.2018 | HR | 11.04.2018 | LT | 11.04.2018 | LV | 11.04.2018 | MC | 11.04.2018 | MK | 11.04.2018 | MT | 11.04.2018 | PL | 11.04.2018 | RO | 11.04.2018 | SI | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | SM | 11.04.2018 | TR | 11.04.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | NO | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | IS | 11.08.2018 | PT | 13.08.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 23.02.2010 | |
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
MT | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IS | 11.08.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | CY | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
MT | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IS | 11.08.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
MT | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | CZ | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
MT | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | CZ | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2003062210 (FARMER SHALETTE M [US]) [X] 1,2,13 * the whole document * [I] 3; | [XI]US2008118797 (HIRAKATA SHUJI [JP]) [X] 1,2,13 * the whole document * [I] 3; | [X]EP1995109 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0808980 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,13 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 14 * |