EP2393773 - METHOD FOR SYNTHESIZING AN OMEGA-AMINO ACID OR ESTER FROM A MONOUNSATURATED FATTY ACID OR ESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema France 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBOIS, Jean-Luc 190 rue du Coteau F-69390 Millery / FR | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Sauvageot, Olivier Roger Arkema France DPI/DRD 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2011/50] | Application number, filing date | 10708286.9 | 05.02.2010 | WO2010FR50186 | Priority number, date | FR20090050704 | 05.02.2009 Original published format: FR 0950704 | [2011/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010089512 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2393773 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2393773 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07C227/06, C07C229/08, C07C253/22, C07C253/30, C07C51/353, C12P7/44 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
C07C229/08 (EP,KR,US);
C07C227/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07C253/22 (EP,KR,US);
C07C253/30 (EP,KR,US);
C07C51/353 (EP,US);
C12P7/46 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C253/22, C07C255/09 (US,EP);
C07C253/22, C07C255/19 (US,EP);
C07C253/30, C07C255/09 (US,EP);
C07C253/30, C07C255/19 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER OMEGA-AMINOSÄURE ODER EINES ESTERS AUS EINER EINFACH UNGESÄTTIGTEN FETTSÄURE ODER EINEM FETTSÄUREESTER | [2014/25] | English: | METHOD FOR SYNTHESIZING AN OMEGA-AMINO ACID OR ESTER FROM A MONOUNSATURATED FATTY ACID OR ESTER | [2011/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE D'UN OMEGA-AMINOACIDE OU ESTER À PARTIR D'UN ACIDE OU ESTER GRAS MONO-INSATURÉ | [2014/25] |
Former [2011/50] | VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE EINER OMEGA-AMINOSÄURE ODER EINES ESTERS AUS EINER EINFACH UNGESÄTTIGTEN FETTSÄURE ODER EINES EINFACH UNGESÄTTIGTEN FETTSÄUREESTERS | ||
Former [2011/50] | PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE D'UN OMEGA-AMINOACIDE OU ESTER A PARTIR D'UN ACIDE OU ESTER GRAS MONO-INSATURE | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 02.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.02.2010 | AT | 17.09.2014 | BG | 17.09.2014 | CY | 17.09.2014 | CZ | 17.09.2014 | DK | 17.09.2014 | EE | 17.09.2014 | ES | 17.09.2014 | FI | 17.09.2014 | HR | 17.09.2014 | IT | 17.09.2014 | LT | 17.09.2014 | LV | 17.09.2014 | MC | 17.09.2014 | MK | 17.09.2014 | MT | 17.09.2014 | PL | 17.09.2014 | RO | 17.09.2014 | SE | 17.09.2014 | SI | 17.09.2014 | SK | 17.09.2014 | SM | 17.09.2014 | TR | 17.09.2014 | NO | 17.12.2014 | GR | 18.12.2014 | IS | 17.01.2015 | PT | 19.01.2015 | IE | 05.02.2015 | LU | 05.02.2015 | BE | 28.02.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 05.02.2010 | |
AT | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
IE | 05.02.2015 | ||
LU | 05.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
IE | 05.02.2015 | ||
LU | 05.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
IE | 05.02.2015 | ||
LU | 05.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 05.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 05.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 05.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 17.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]GB741739 (COURTAULDS LTD) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US3974196 (NAKAMURA RYUICHI, et al) [A] 1-11* example 37 *; | [A]WO2008104722 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * example -; claim - *; | [AD] - R. B. PERKINS JR. ET AL., "Nylon-9 from Unsaturated Fatty Derivatives: Preparation and Characterization", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY., SPRINGER, BERLIN., (197511), vol. 52, pages 473 - 477, XP002545488 [AD] 1-11 * page 473, column 2 - page 475, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02637493 | [A] - HELEN L.NGO ET AL., "Metathesis of Unsaturated Fatty Acids: Synthesis of Long-Chain Unsaturated-alpha,omega-Dicarboxylic Acids", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY., SPRINGER, BERLIN., (2006), vol. 83, no. 7, pages 629 - 634, XP002545489 [A] 1-11 * page 631, column 1, line 1 - line 34 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11746-006-1249-0 | by applicant | GB741739 | GB743491 | US2813113 | US3823070 | US3912586 | FR2445374 | US4474882 | US5254466 | US6569670 | US6660505 | - N-NYLONS, Their Synthesis, Structure and Properties, J. WILEY ET SONS, pages 381 - 389 | - E. H. PRYDE ET AL., "Aldehydic Materials by the Ozonization of Vegetable Oils", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS ' SOCIETY, (1962), vol. 39, pages 496 - 500 | - PILOT RUN, PLANT DESIGN AND COST ANALYSIS FOR REDUCTIVE OZONOLYSIS OF METHYL SOYATE, vol. 49, pages 643 - 648 | - R.B. PERKINS ET AL., "Nylon-9 from Unsaturated Fatty Derivatives : Preparation and Characterization", JAOCS, vol. 52, pages 473 - 477 | - "Transformation of fatty Acids Catalyzed by Cytochrome P450 Monooxygenase Enzymes of Candida tropicalis", W. H. ESCHENFELDT ET AL., Applied and Environmental Microbiology, (200310), pages 5992 - 5999 | - "Catalytic metathesis of unsaturated fatty acid esters and oil", J.C. MOL, Topics in Catalysis, PLENUM PUBLISHING, (200402), vol. 27 | - SCHROCK ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1986), vol. 108, page 2771 | - BASSET ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM., ED. ENGL., (1992), vol. 31, page 628 | - GRUBBS ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM., ED. ENGL., (1995), vol. 34, page 2039 | - ORGANIC LETT., (1999), vol. 1, page 953 | - L.G. WADE JR., Organic Chemistry | - F. DRAWERT ET AL., CHEM. MIKROBIOL. TECHNOL. LEBENSM., (1972), vol. 1, pages 158 - 159 | - G.S. ZHANG ET AL., CHINESE CHEMICAL LETTERS, (1994), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 105 - 108 |