EP2406394 - REAGENTS AND METHODS FOR PCR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRANDEIS UNIVERSITY 415 South Street Waltham, MA 02254 / US | [2012/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANGH, Lawrence, J. 20 Duffield Road Auburndale, MA 02466 / US | 02 /
RICE, John 268 Common Street Quincy, MA 02169 / US | 03 /
RICE, Nicholas 268 Common Street Quincy, MA 02169 / US | 04 /
JIA, Yanwei 17 Prospect Street Apartment 4 Waltham, MA 02543 / US | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Lee Phillip, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2014/28] |
Former [2014/02] | Ford, Hazel, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/03] | Ford, Hazel, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10708682.9 | 11.03.2010 | WO2010US27011 | Priority number, date | US20090202565P | 12.03.2009 Original published format: US 202565 P | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010105074 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2406394 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2406394 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6806 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6853 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2545/114, C12Q2531/107, C12Q2527/107 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6853, C12Q2545/114, C12Q2531/107, C12Q2527/107 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REAGENTIEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR PCR | [2012/03] | English: | REAGENTS AND METHODS FOR PCR | [2012/03] | French: | RÉACTIFS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR PCR | [2012/03] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 30.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13195156.8 / EP2703501 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2010 | AT | 08.01.2014 | BE | 08.01.2014 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | ES | 08.01.2014 | FI | 08.01.2014 | HR | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | LV | 08.01.2014 | MC | 08.01.2014 | MK | 08.01.2014 | MT | 08.01.2014 | NL | 08.01.2014 | PL | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | SM | 08.01.2014 | TR | 08.01.2014 | LU | 11.03.2014 | NO | 08.04.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 11.03.2010 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.03.2010 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006044994 (UNIV BRANDEIS [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * pages 3-76; examples 2-4,16 *; | [A]WO03054233 (UNIV BRANDEIS [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [Y] - KAINZ PETER ET AL, "Specificity-enhanced hot-start PCR: Addition of double-stranded DNA fragments adapted to the annealing temperature", BIOTECHNIQUES, INFORMA LIFE SCIENCES PUBLISHING, WESTBOROUGH, MA, US, (20000201), vol. 28, no. 2, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 278 - 282, XP002202181 [Y] 1-40 * the whole document * | [Y] - KABOEV O K ET AL, "PCR hot start using primers with the structure of molecular beacons (hairpin-like structure)", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1093/NAR/28.21.E94, (20001101), vol. 28, no. 21, ISSN 0305-1048, page E94, XP002244959 [Y] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/28.21.e94 | [A] - SANCHEZ J AQUILES ET AL, "Linear-After-The-Exponential (LATE)-PCR: An advanced method of asymmetric PCR and its uses in quantitative real-time analysis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES (PNAS), NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, US LNKD- DOI:10.1073/PNAS.0305476101, (20040217), vol. 101, no. 7, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1933 - 1938, XP002492383 [A] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0305476101 | Examination | WO2007008728 | WO2004090153 | by applicant | US4683202 | US4683195 | US4965188 | US5994056 | US5487972 | US5925517 | US6150097 | US5066584 | WO03054233 | US5677152 | US5773258 | US5338671 | US6020130 | US6277607 | - HAAS ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1998), vol. 26, pages 3006 - 3012 | - RYCHLIK ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES, (1989), vol. 17, no. 21, pages 8543 - 8551 | - HILBER ET AL., "OSP: a computer program for choosing PCR and DNA sequencing primers", PCR METHODS APPL., (1991), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 124 - 128 | - LI ET AL., GENOMICS, (1997), vol. 40, no. 3, pages 476 - 485 | - PROUTSKI ET AL., COMPUT APPL BIOSCI, (1996), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 253 - 255 | - GYLLENSTEN; ERLICH, "Generation of Single-Stranded DNA by the Polymerase Chain Reaction and Its Application to Direct Sequencing of the HLA-DQA Locus", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA), (1988), vol. 85, pages 7652 - 7656 | - SANCHEZ ET AL., PNAS, (2004), vol. 101, pages 1933 - 1938 | - PIERCE ET AL., PNAS, (2005), vol. 102, pages 8609 - 8614 | - DOUG; JAYASENA, J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 264, pages 268 - 278 | - NEWTON ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 2503 - 2516 | - WU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 2757 - 2760 | - KAINZ ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (2000), vol. 28, pages 278 - 282 | - MARKHAN; ZUKER, "DINAMELT web server for nucleic acid melting prediction", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2005), vol. 33, pages W577 - W581 | - Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, pages 3 - 31 | - SANTA LUCIA, J., PNAS (USA), (1998), vol. 95, pages 1460 - 1465 | - ALLAWI, H. T.; SANTA LUCIA, J., BIOCHEM., (1997), vol. 36, pages 10581 - 10594 | - "LJNAFOLD: software for nucleic acid folding and hybridization", MARKHAM; ZUKER, BIOINFORMATICS, vol. II, Structure, Functions and Applications, No. 453 in Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (2008), vol. II, pages 3 - 31 | - RICE, J.E. ET AL., "Monoplex/Multiplex Linear-After-The-Exponential PCR Assay Combined with PrimeSafe and Dilute-'N'-Go Sequencing", NATURE PROTOCOLS, (2007), vol. 2, pages 2429 - 2438 | - NEWTON ET AL., "Analysis of any point mutation in DNA. The amplification refractory mutation system (ARMS)", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 2503 - 2516 | US20050242506 |