EP2393502 - ANTIBACTERIAL PHAGE, PHAGE PEPTIDES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technophage, Investigação E Desenvolvimento Em Biotecnologia, SA Avenida Professor Egas Moniz Edificio Egas Moniz Piso 2 Sala A8 1649-028 Lisboa / PT | For all designated states Tecnifar-Indústria Técnica Farmacêutica, S.A. Rua Tierno Galva Torre 3 12 Piso 1099-036 Lisboa / PT | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DA COSTA GARCIA, Miguel Ângelo Av. de Pádua n.º 10 4ºB P-1800-297 Lisboa / PT | 02 /
SOUSA DE SÃO JOSÉ, Carlos Jorge Rua Alferes Barrilaro Ruas N.º 9 2º Dt.º/7 P-1800-007 Lisboa / PT | 03 /
RODRIGUES LEANDRO, Clara Isabel Praceta Eugénio Salvador Lt. 10 R/c C P-2775-089 Lisboa / PT | 04 /
RODRIGUES PARDAL DIAS ANTUNES MARÇAL DA SILVA, @Filipa Maria Rua do Vale N.º1 4º Dt.º Belas Clube de Campo P-2605-193 Belas / PT | 05 /
FERREIRA LLORENTE GRANCHO LOURENÇO, Sara Rua de Fanares 15 1.º Dt.º P-2725-307 Mem Martins / PT | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Ferreira, Maria Silvina Clarke, Modet & Co Av. Casal Ribeiro, N°50-3° andar 1000-93 Lisboa / PT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/35] | Ferreira, Maria Silvina Clarke, Modet & Co. Rua Castilho, 50-9° 1269-163 Lisboa / PT | ||
Former [2011/50] | Ferreira, Maria Silvina Clarke, Modet & Co. Rua Castilho, 50-9° 1269-163 Lisboa / PT | Application number, filing date | 10708834.6 | 05.02.2010 | [2016/35] | WO2010PT00003 | Priority number, date | US20090150585P | 06.02.2009 Original published format: US 150585 P | US20090218345P | 18.06.2009 Original published format: US 218345 P | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010090542 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2393502 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2393502 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K35/76, C07K14/005, C12N7/00, C12N9/64, G01N33/569 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
A61K35/76 (EP,RU,US);
A61K9/0014 (RU,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,RU,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,RU,US);
A61K9/0073 (US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,RU,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,RU,US);
C12N9/6489 (EP,RU,US);
G01N33/56911 (EP,RU,US);
C12N2795/00032 (US);
C12N2795/10021 (EP,US);
C12N2795/10022 (EP,US);
C12N2795/10032 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/50] | A61K35/76 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIBAKTERIELLE PHAGEN, PHAGEN-PEPTIDE UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/10] | English: | ANTIBACTERIAL PHAGE, PHAGE PEPTIDES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2011/50] | French: | PHAGE ANTIBACTÉRIEN, PEPTIDES PHAGES ET MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [2011/50] |
Former [2011/50] | ANTIBAKTERIELLER PHAGE, PHAGENPEPTIDE UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAVON | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 15.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.02.2016 | 02.02.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16172292.1 / EP3115054 | EP19201853.9 / EP3650034 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.02.2010 | AT | 31.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CY | 31.08.2016 | CZ | 31.08.2016 | DK | 31.08.2016 | EE | 31.08.2016 | ES | 31.08.2016 | FI | 31.08.2016 | HR | 31.08.2016 | IT | 31.08.2016 | LT | 31.08.2016 | LV | 31.08.2016 | MC | 31.08.2016 | MK | 31.08.2016 | NL | 31.08.2016 | PL | 31.08.2016 | RO | 31.08.2016 | SE | 31.08.2016 | SI | 31.08.2016 | SK | 31.08.2016 | SM | 31.08.2016 | TR | 31.08.2016 | BG | 30.11.2016 | NO | 30.11.2016 | GR | 01.12.2016 | IS | 31.12.2016 | PT | 02.01.2017 | GB | 05.02.2017 | IE | 05.02.2017 | LU | 05.02.2017 | MT | 05.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | FR | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 05.02.2010 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
TR | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 05.02.2017 | ||
IE | 05.02.2017 | ||
LU | 05.02.2017 | ||
MT | 05.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 05.02.2010 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 05.02.2017 | ||
IE | 05.02.2017 | ||
LU | 05.02.2017 | ||
MT | 05.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 05.02.2010 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 05.02.2017 | ||
IE | 05.02.2017 | ||
LU | 05.02.2017 | ||
MT | 05.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.02.2010 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 05.02.2017 | ||
IE | 05.02.2017 | ||
LU | 05.02.2017 | ||
MT | 05.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 05.02.2017 | ||
IE | 05.02.2017 | ||
LU | 05.02.2017 | ||
MT | 05.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 05.02.2017 | ||
IE | 05.02.2017 | ||
LU | 05.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
LU | 05.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
LU | 05.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 31.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0069269 (EXPONENTIAL BIOTHERAPIES INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2004052274 (PHAGE BIOPHARM LLC [US], et al); | [E]WO2010041970 (LUSOMEDICAMENTA S A [PT], et al); | by applicant | US5807715 |