EP2404170 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A GAS CHROMATOGRAPH TO MASS SPECTROMETER INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermo Finnigan LLC 355 River Oaks Parkway San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2012/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCAULEY, Edward, B. 1206 Tremont Drive Cedar Park TX 78613 / US | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/02] | Frost, Alex John Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road GB-London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 10708845.2 | 01.03.2010 | [2017/16] | WO2010US25811 | Priority number, date | US20090399574 | 06.03.2009 Original published format: US 399574 | [2012/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010101848 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2404170 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2404170 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/72, H01J49/04, G01N30/30 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
G01N30/7206 (EP,US);
G01N30/30 (EP,US);
H01J49/0404 (EP,US);
H01J49/0422 (EP,US);
G01N2030/3084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE GASCHROMATOGRAPH-ZU-MASSENSPEKTROMETER-SCHNITTSTELLE | [2012/02] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A GAS CHROMATOGRAPH TO MASS SPECTROMETER INTERFACE | [2012/02] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR UNE INTERFACE ENTRE UN CHROMATOGRAPHE A PHASE GAZEUSE ET UN SPECTROMETRE DE MASSE | [2016/43] |
Former [2012/02] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UNE INTERFACE ENTRE UN CHROMATOGRAPHE GAZEUX ET UN SPECTROMÈTRE DE MASSE | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 20.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.03.2010 | AT | 19.04.2017 | CY | 19.04.2017 | CZ | 19.04.2017 | DK | 19.04.2017 | EE | 19.04.2017 | ES | 19.04.2017 | FI | 19.04.2017 | HR | 19.04.2017 | IT | 19.04.2017 | LT | 19.04.2017 | LV | 19.04.2017 | MC | 19.04.2017 | MK | 19.04.2017 | NL | 19.04.2017 | PL | 19.04.2017 | PT | 19.04.2017 | RO | 19.04.2017 | SE | 19.04.2017 | SI | 19.04.2017 | SK | 19.04.2017 | SM | 19.04.2017 | TR | 19.04.2017 | BG | 19.07.2017 | NO | 19.07.2017 | GR | 20.07.2017 | IS | 19.08.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 01.03.2010 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 19.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2008048107 (MCEWEN CHARLES NEHEMIAH [US]) [X] 1-3,5,12-14,19-23 * abstract * * column 5, paragraph 0041 - column 6, paragraph 0048 * * claims 18,24 * * figure 1 * [I] 4,10,11; | [Y]US6126728 (WALSH GEORGE P [US], et al) [Y] 8,9,17,18,23 * abstract * * column 2, line 17 - line 34; figure 2 * * column 3, line 43 - line 53 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5837883 (ITOI HIROTO [JP]) [A] 1,12,19 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2004126276 (ILGEN GUNTER [DE], et al) [A] 1,12,19 * the whole document * | [IY] - ZIMMERMANN R ET AL, "HYPHENATION OF GAS CHROMATOGRAPHY AND RESONANCE-ENHANCED LASER MASS SPECTROMETRY (REMPI-TOFMS): A MULTIDIMENSIONAL ANALYTICAL TECHNIQUE", JOURNAL OF HIGH RESOLUTION CHROMATOGRAPHY, WILEY VCH, WEINHEIM, DE LNKD- DOI:10.1002/JHRC.1240200902, (19970901), vol. 20, no. 9, ISSN 0935-6304, pages 461 - 470, XP000720829 [I] 6,7,15,16 * abstract * * figure 4 * [Y] 8,9,17,18,23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhrc.1240200902 | by applicant | US2008048107 | - F. MUNARI; S. TRESTIANU, "Thermal peak splitting in capillary gas chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1983), vol. 279, doi:doi:10.1016/S0021-9673(01)93646-5, pages 457 - 472, XP026465651 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(01)93646-5 |