EP2400879 - MULTIFUNCTIONAL DEVICE FOR EXPLORATION AND/OR INTERVENTION, ESPECIALLY FOR MEDICAL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pineau, Charles-Henri Chemin du Pech 82000 Montauban / FR | For all designated states Coupellier, Hervé Braguillou 82170 Fabas / FR | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Hartmann, Jean-Luc, et al Cabinet Morelle & Bardou SC Parc Technologique du Canal 9, Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Saint-Agne Cedex / FR | [2013/09] |
Former [2012/01] | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou Parc Technologique du Canal 9, Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 F-31522 Ramonville Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10710067.9 | 24.02.2010 | WO2010FR00173 | Priority number, date | FR20090000853 | 25.02.2009 Original published format: FR 0900853 | [2012/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010097526 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2400879 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2400879 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/018 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
A61B17/3478 (EP,US);
A61B17/32056 (EP,US);
A61M25/01 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00269 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00353 (EP,US);
A61M25/0097 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONSGERÄT FÜR UNTERSUCHUNGEN UND/ODER EINGRIFFE, INS BESONDERE FÜR MEDIZINISCHE ZWECKE | [2012/32] | English: | MULTIFUNCTIONAL DEVICE FOR EXPLORATION AND/OR INTERVENTION, ESPECIALLY FOR MEDICAL USE | [2012/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF MULTIFONCTIONS D'EXPLORATION ET/OU D'INTERVENTION, NOTAMMENT À USAGE MÉDICAL. | [2012/01] |
Former [2012/01] | MULTIFUNKTIONSGERÄT FÜR UNTERSUCHUNGEN UND/ODER EINGRIFFE, IM BESONDEREN FÜR MEDIZINISCHE ZWECKE | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 16.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 01.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.06.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2010 | AT | 12.12.2012 | CY | 12.12.2012 | CZ | 12.12.2012 | DK | 12.12.2012 | EE | 12.12.2012 | FI | 12.12.2012 | HR | 12.12.2012 | LT | 12.12.2012 | LV | 12.12.2012 | MK | 12.12.2012 | MT | 12.12.2012 | PL | 12.12.2012 | RO | 12.12.2012 | SE | 12.12.2012 | SI | 12.12.2012 | SK | 12.12.2012 | SM | 12.12.2012 | TR | 12.12.2012 | MC | 28.02.2013 | BG | 12.03.2013 | NO | 12.03.2013 | GR | 13.03.2013 | IS | 12.04.2013 | PT | 12.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MK | 12.12.2012 | ||
MT | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
SM | 12.12.2012 | ||
TR | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MT | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
SM | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MT | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
NO | 12.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5741271 (NAKAO NAOMI L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 30 - line 49; figures 1,A *; | [A]US5323768 (SAITO TATSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 4 - line 26; figure 4 *; | [A]US2005085692 (KIEHN RALF [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1665993 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0058]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0105]; figure 18 * | by applicant | EP1665993 |