EP2436129 - DEVICE CARRYING RADIO-FREQUENCY SIGNALS WHICH HAS EXTREMELY LOW SPURIOUS RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAEMER, Wilhelm Müllnerhorngasse 1 83435 Bad Reichenhall / DE | 02 /
KRAUS, Wolfgang Bahnhofstr. 50 83620 Feldkirchen-Westerham / DE | 03 /
MARTSCHENKO, Georg Kurgartenstr. 19 90762 Fürth / DE | 04 /
STRECKER, Helmut Am Weichselgarten 36 85630 Grasbrunn / DE | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Körfer, Thomas, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/02] | Körfer, Thomas, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/14] | Körfer, Thomas, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10710540.5 | 10.03.2010 | [2016/02] | WO2010EP01484 | Priority number, date | DE20091022760 | 27.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009022760 | [2012/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010136089 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2436129 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2436129 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00, H04B15/02 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
H04B15/02 (EP);
H04B17/0085 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/14] | H04B15/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENZSIGNALE-FÜHRENDES GERÄT MIT ÄUSSERST GERINGER STÖRSTRAHLUNG | [2012/14] | English: | DEVICE CARRYING RADIO-FREQUENCY SIGNALS WHICH HAS EXTREMELY LOW SPURIOUS RADIATION | [2012/14] | French: | APPAREIL DE GUIDAGE DE SIGNAUX À HAUTE FRÉQUENCE, À RAYONNEMENT PARASITE EXTRÊMEMENT RÉDUIT | [2012/14] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 04.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 18.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2010 | CY | 13.01.2016 | CZ | 13.01.2016 | DK | 13.01.2016 | EE | 13.01.2016 | ES | 13.01.2016 | FI | 13.01.2016 | HR | 13.01.2016 | IT | 13.01.2016 | LT | 13.01.2016 | LV | 13.01.2016 | MC | 13.01.2016 | MK | 13.01.2016 | MT | 13.01.2016 | NL | 13.01.2016 | PL | 13.01.2016 | RO | 13.01.2016 | SE | 13.01.2016 | SI | 13.01.2016 | SK | 13.01.2016 | SM | 13.01.2016 | TR | 13.01.2016 | AT | 10.03.2016 | IE | 10.03.2016 | LU | 10.03.2016 | BE | 31.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.04.2016 | IS | 13.05.2016 | PT | 13.05.2016 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.03.2010 | |
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
AT | 10.03.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 10.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
AT | 10.03.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 10.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | CZ | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 10.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 10.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
LU | 10.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 13.01.2016 | |
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
LU | 10.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | DK | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
LU | 10.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 13.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1727201 (HOU PONWEI [TW]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0040] * [I] 3-5,9,10; | [A]EP1860929 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 1-10 * figures 4-6 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0055] *; | [A] - Kuhne electronic GmbH, "Baubeschreibung / Kit DB 6 NT 10GHz Transverter MK2", (20080701), URL: http://www.kuhne-electronic.de/userfiles/_pdf/kit-handbuecher/transverter/10ghz/10g2.pdf, (20100519), XP002582793 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | CA2503306 |