EP2411412 - HUMANIZED ANTIBODIES AGAINST LIGHT AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: MT | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teva Biopharmaceuticals USA, Inc. 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Rodger 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 02 /
KANAKARAJ, Palanisamy 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 03 /
COOKSEY, Bridget, A. 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 04 /
ROSCHKE, Viktor 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 05 /
ROSEN, Craig 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2015/22] |
Former [2012/05] | 01 /
SMITH, Rodger 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville MD 20850 / US | ||
02 /
KANAKARAJ, Palanisamy 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville MD 20850 / US | |||
03 /
COOKSEY, Bridget, A. 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville MD 20850 / US | |||
04 /
ROSCHKE, Viktor 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville MD 20850 / US | |||
05 /
ROSEN, Craig 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville MD 20850 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | O'Brien, Simon Warwick D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10710753.4 | 22.03.2010 | WO2010US28144 | Priority number, date | US20090202661P | 24.03.2009 Original published format: US 202661 P | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010111180 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2411412 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2411412 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, G01N33/53, C07K16/28 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
C07K16/2875 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/05] | C07K16/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HUMANISIERTE ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN LICHT UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2012/05] | English: | HUMANIZED ANTIBODIES AGAINST LIGHT AND USES THEREOF | [2012/05] | French: | ANTICORPS HUMANISÉS DIRIGÉS CONTRE LE POLYPEPTIDE LIGHT ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 11.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.07.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2010 | AT | 27.05.2015 | BE | 27.05.2015 | CY | 27.05.2015 | CZ | 27.05.2015 | DK | 27.05.2015 | EE | 27.05.2015 | ES | 27.05.2015 | FI | 27.05.2015 | HR | 27.05.2015 | IT | 27.05.2015 | LT | 27.05.2015 | LV | 27.05.2015 | MC | 27.05.2015 | MK | 27.05.2015 | NL | 27.05.2015 | PL | 27.05.2015 | RO | 27.05.2015 | SE | 27.05.2015 | SI | 27.05.2015 | SK | 27.05.2015 | SM | 27.05.2015 | TR | 27.05.2015 | BG | 27.08.2015 | NO | 27.08.2015 | GR | 28.08.2015 | IS | 27.09.2015 | PT | 28.09.2015 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 22.03.2010 | |
AT | 27.05.2015 | ||
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MK | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
SM | 27.05.2015 | ||
TR | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.03.2010 | |
AT | 27.05.2015 | ||
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MK | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
SM | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO03089575 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-30 * The whole document, in particular;; examples 1-3 *; | [I]WO2008027338 (KIRIN PHARMA KK [JP], et al) [I] 1-30 * The whole document, in particular;; examples 1-7 *; | [AP] - Sanofi Aventis Press Dept., "Sanofi-aventis and Kyowa Hakko Kirinenter into a Collaboration and Licensing Agreementon an Anti LIGHT fully human monoclonal antibody", (20090514), Sanofi-aventis.com, URL: http://en.sanofi-aventis.com/binaries/20090514_kirin-khk_en_en_tcm28-25122.pdf, (20100629), XP007913657 [AP] 1-30 * the whole document * | [A] - WANG JING ET AL, "Dysregulated LIGHT expression on T cells mediates intestinal inflammation and contributes to IgA nephropathy.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (200403), vol. 113, no. 6, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 826 - 835, XP009135527 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * | [A] - YU PING ET AL, "Priming of naive T cells inside tumors leads to eradication of established tumors", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1038/NI1029, (20040201), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 1529-2908, pages 141 - 149, XP009130369 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni1029 | [A] - MOREL Y ET AL, "Reciprocal Expression of the TNF family receptor herpes virus entry mediator and its ligand LIGHT on activated T cells: Light down-regulates its own receptor", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (20001015), vol. 165, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 4397 - 4404, XP002197451 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * | [A] - HARROP J A ET AL, "HERPESVIRUS ENTRY MEDIATOR LIGAND (HVEM-L), A NOVEL LIGAND FOR HVEM/TR2, STIMULATES PROLIFERATION OF T CELLS AND INHIBITS HT29 CELL GROWTH", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, INC, US LNKD- DOI:10.1074/JBC.273.42.27548, (19981016), vol. 273, no. 42, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 27548 - 27556, XP002947574 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.42.27548 | [A] - MAURI D N ET AL, "LIGHT, A NEW MEMBER OF THE TNF SUPERFAMILY AND LYMPHOTOXIN ALPHA ARE LIGANDS FOR HERPESVIRUS ENTRY MEDIATOR", IMMUNITY, CELL PRESS, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S1074-7613(00)80455-0, (19980121), vol. 8, ISSN 1074-7613, pages 21 - 30, XP002947575 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-7613(00)80455-0 | Examination | - UNIPROT, "Alignment of human and cynomolgous monkey LIGHT/TNFSF14", (20140114), URL: http://www.uniprot.org/align/201401142BG9K5IXNO, (20140114), XP055096438 | by applicant | US4444887 | WO8605807 | US4694778 | EP0239400 | US4716111 | US4741900 | WO8901036 | US4816567 | US4816397 | WO8912624 | US4946778 | EP0396387 | US4980286 | WO9109967 | WO9110741 | WO9114438 | US5116964 | WO9208495 | US5122464 | EP0519596 | US5225538 | US5225539 | US5258498 | EP0592106 | US5314995 | US5413923 | US5530101 | US5545806 | US5565332 | US5569825 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | US5585089 | US5589369 | US5591669 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5658570 | US5661016 | US5693761 | US5693762 | US5693780 | US5736137 | WO9816654 | US5756096 | WO9824893 | US5807715 | US5811524 | US5814318 | WO9846645 | WO9850433 | WO9852976 | US5892019 | US5939598 | US6075181 | WO0034317 | US6150584 | US6180370 | US6190370 | US6193980 | US6413777 | US6420140 | US2002123057 | US6458592 | US2003157641 | - HAMERS-CASTERMAN ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 363, pages 446 - 448 | - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., J MOI. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - ROUX ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 161, page 4083 | - HARLOW ET AL., Antibodies: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1988), pages 27 - 28 | - Posttranslational Covalent Modification Of Proteins, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1983), pages 1 - 12 | - SEIFTER ET AL., METH ENZYMOL, (1990), vol. 182, pages 626 - 646 | - RATTAN ET AL., ANN NYACAD SCI, (1992), vol. 663, pages 48 - 62 | - GASCOIGNE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 54, pages 2936 - 2940 | - CAPON ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 337, pages 525 - 531 | - TRAUNECKER ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 339, pages 68 - 70 | - ZETTMEISSL ET AL., DNA CELL BIOL. USA, (1990), vol. 9, pages 347 - 353 | - BYRN ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 344, pages 667 - 670 | - WATSON ET AL., J. CELL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 110, pages 2221 - 2229 | - WATSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 349, pages 164 - 167 | - ARUFFO ET AL., CELL, (1990), vol. 57, pages 1303 - 1313 | - LINSLEY ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1991), vol. 773, pages 721 - 730 | - LISLEY ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1991), vol. 174, pages 561 - 569 | - STAMENKOVIC, CELL, (1991), vol. 66, pages 1133 - 1144 | - ASHKENAZI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1991), vol. 55, pages 10535 - 10539 | - LESSLAUER ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 27, pages 2883 - 2886 | - PEPPEL ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1991), vol. 774, pages 1483 - 1489 | - RIDGWAY; GORMAN, J. CELL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 115 | - LEONG, S.R. ET AL., CYTOKINE, (2001), vol. 16, page 106 | - ADV. IN DRUG DELIV. REV., (2002), vol. 54, page 531 | - WEIR ET AL., RIOCHEM. SOC. TRANSACTIONS, (2002), vol. 30, page 512 | - GENTZ ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1989), vol. 55, pages 821 - 824 | - WILSON ET AL., CELL, (1984), vol. 37, page 161 | - BRIZZARD, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1994), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 730 - 735 | - "Monoclonal Antibodies For Immunotargeting Of Drugs In Cancer Therapy", AMON ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies And Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, INC., (1985), pages 243 - 56 | - "Antibodies For Drug Delivery", HCLLSTROM ET AL., Controlled Drug Delivery, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1987), pages 623 - 53 | - "Antibody Carriers Of Cytotoxic Agents In Cancer Therapy: A Review", THORPE, Monoclonal Antibodies '84: Biological And Clinical Applications, (1985), pages 475 - 506 | - "Analysis, Results, And Future Prospective Of The Therapeutic Use Of Radiolabeled Antibody In Cancer Therapy", Monoclonal Antibodies For Cancer Detection And Therapy, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1985), pages 303 - 16 | - THORPE ET AL., "The Preparation And Cytotoxic Properties Of Antibody-Toxin Conjugates", IMMUNOL. REV., (1982), vol. 52, pages 119 - 58 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 57, pages 6851 - 6855 | - MORRISON ET AL., ADV. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 44, pages 65 - 92 | - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - PADLAN, MOLEC. IMMUN., (1991), vol. 25, pages 489 - 498 | - PADLAN, MOLEC. IMMUN., (1994), vol. 31, pages 169 - 217 | - HAMMERLING ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and T- Cell Hybridomas, ELSEVIER, (1981), pages 563 - 681 | - BIRD, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 442 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 55, pages 5879 - 5883 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 334, pages 544 - 554 | - SKERRA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 1038 - 1041 | - HUSTON ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1991), vol. 203, pages 46 - 88 | - SHU ET AL., PROC. NATL. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 1995 - 1999 | - SKERRA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1038 - 1040 | - MORRISON, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 1202 | - OI ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1986), vol. 4, page 214 | - GILLIES ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1989), vol. 125, pages 191 - 202 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, page 323 | - PADLAN, MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 28, no. 4, 5, pages 489 - 498 | - STUDNICKA ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1994), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 805 - 814 | - ROGUSKA ET AL., PROC. NATL. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 969 - 973 | - LONBERG; HUSZAR, INT. REV. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 73, pages 65 - 93 | - JESPERS ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 72, pages 899 - 903 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 278, pages 457 - 479 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), pages 85 I - 855 | - NEUBERGER ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 372, pages 604 - 608 | - TAKEDA ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, pages 452 - 454 | - NEWMAN, BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 1455 - 1460 | - PROUDFOOT, NATURE, (1986), vol. 322, page 52 | - KOHLER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 2197 | - "Mammalian Expression Vectors", RIDGWAY, A. A. G., Vectors, BUTTERWORTHS, (1988), pages 470 - 472 | - FOECKING ET AL., GENE, (1986), vol. 5, page 101 | - COCKETT ET AL., BIO/TECHNOTOGY, (1990), vol. 8, page 2 | - WIGLER ET AL., CELL, (1977), vol. 11, page 223 | - SZYBALSKA; SZYBALSKI, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 48, page 202 | - LOWY ET AL., CELL, (1980), vol. 22, page 817 | - WIGLER ET AL., NATL. ACUD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 357 | - O'HARE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1981), vol. 78, page 1527 | - MULLIGAN; BERG, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1981), vol. 78, page 2072 | - WU; WU, BIOTHERAPY, (1991), vol. 3, pages 87 - 95 | - SANTERRE ET AL., GENE, (1984), vol. 30, page 147 | - COLBERRE-GARAPIN ET AL., J MOL. BIOL., (1981), vol. 150, page 1 | - DNA cloning, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1987), vol. 3 | - GROUSE ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, page 257 | - RUTHER ET AL., EMBO J., (1983), vol. 2, page 1791 | - INOUYE; INOUYE, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1985), vol. 73, pages 3101 - 3109 | - VAN HEEKE; SCHUSTER, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 24, pages 5503 - 5509 | - STINCHCOMB ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 252, page 39 | - KINGSMAN ET AL., GENE, (1979), vol. 7, page 141 | - TSCHEMPER ET AL., GENE, (1980), vol. 10, page 157 | - JONES, GENETICS, (1977), vol. 85, page 12 | - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 | - TREAT ET AL., Liposomes in the Therapy of Infectious Disease and Cancer, LISS, (1989), pages 353 - 365 | - SEFTON, CRC CRIT. REF BIOMED. ENG., (1987), vol. 14, page 201 | - BUCHWALD ET AL., SURGERY, (1980), vol. 88, page 507 | - SAUDEK ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1989), vol. 321, page 574 | - RANGER; PEPPAS, J., MACROMOL. SCI. REV. MACROMOL. CHEM., (1983), vol. 23, page 61 | - LEVY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, page 190 | - DURING ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (1989), vol. 25, page 351 | - HOWARD ET AL., J. NEUROSURG., (1989), vol. 71, page 105 | - GOODSON, MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1984), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138 | - JOLIOT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 1864 - 1868 | - WU; WU, J BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 4429 - 4432 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (19860529), vol. 321, no. 6069, pages 522 - 5 | - ROGUSKA ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1996), vol. 9, no. 10, pages 895 - 904 | - STUDNICKA ET AL., "Humanizing Mouse Antibody Frameworks While Preserving 3-D Structure", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1994), vol. 7, page 805 |