EP2430043 - NUCLEOTIDE AND AMINO ACID SEQUENCES ENCODING AN EXPORTED PROTEIN I DERIVED FROM PLASMODIUM VIVAX AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [2016/45] |
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Rd. Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIRKENMEYER, Larry G. 500 Hunter Road Glenview Illinois 60025 / US | 02 /
COFFEY, Ruthie E. 63 Darlington Drive Hawthorn Woods Illinois 60047 / US | 03 /
DAWSON, George J. 914 South Dymond Road Libertyville Illinois 60048 / US | 04 /
DESAI, Suresh M. 1408 Amy Lane Libertyville Illinois 60048 / US | 05 /
DILLE, Bruce J. 40841 Nevelier Drive Antioch Illinois 60002 / US | 06 /
MUERHOFF, Anthony S. 121 68th Place Kenosha Wisconsin 53143 / US | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (DE) Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2012/12] | Application number, filing date | 10710757.5 | 23.03.2010 | [2016/45] | WO2010US28234 | Priority number, date | US20090412529 | 27.03.2009 Original published format: US 412529 | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010111220 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2430043 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2430043 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/445 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
C07K14/445 (EP,US);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
G01N33/56905 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
G01N2333/445 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜR EIN EXPORTIERTES PROTEIN I AUS PLASMODIUM VIVAX KODIERENDE NUKLEOTID- UND AMINOSÄURESEQUENZEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2012/12] | English: | NUCLEOTIDE AND AMINO ACID SEQUENCES ENCODING AN EXPORTED PROTEIN I DERIVED FROM PLASMODIUM VIVAX AND USES THEREOF | [2012/12] | French: | SÉQUENCE D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES CODANT POUR "EXPORTED PROTEIN 1" DERIVÉ DE PLASMODIUM VIVAX ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2012/12] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 14.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2010 | AT | 09.11.2016 | BE | 09.11.2016 | CY | 09.11.2016 | CZ | 09.11.2016 | DK | 09.11.2016 | EE | 09.11.2016 | FI | 09.11.2016 | HR | 09.11.2016 | LT | 09.11.2016 | LV | 09.11.2016 | MC | 09.11.2016 | MK | 09.11.2016 | NL | 09.11.2016 | PL | 09.11.2016 | RO | 09.11.2016 | SE | 09.11.2016 | SI | 09.11.2016 | SK | 09.11.2016 | SM | 09.11.2016 | TR | 09.11.2016 | BG | 09.02.2017 | NO | 09.02.2017 | GR | 10.02.2017 | IS | 09.03.2017 | PT | 09.03.2017 | IE | 23.03.2017 | LU | 23.03.2017 | MT | 23.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 23.03.2010 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MK | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
IE | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.03.2017 | ||
MT | 23.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.03.2010 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
IE | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.03.2017 | ||
MT | 23.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.03.2010 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
IE | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.03.2017 | ||
MT | 23.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
IE | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.03.2017 | ||
MT | 23.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
IE | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 09.11.2016 | Cited in | by applicant | EP0050424 | EP0084796 | US4582788 | EP0201184 | US4683202 | US4683194 | EP0237362 | EP0258017 | US4948882 | US5006309 | US5063081 | US5089424 | US5107065 | US5231020 | US5424414 | US5464746 | US5700671 | US5705330 | US5750176 | US6395472 | US2003170881 | US2004018577 | US2005054078 | US2006160164 |