EP2411018 - RNA INTERFERENCE MEDIATED INHIBITION OF THE NERVE GROWTH FACTOR BETA CHAIN (NGFß) GENE EXPRESSION USING SHORT INTERFERING NUCLEIC ACID (SINA) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Schering Corporation 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
Former [2012/05] | For all designated states Merck Sharp&Dohme Corp. 1700 Owens Street 4th Floor San Francisco, California 94158 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRAPPS, Walter 4th Floor 1700 Owens Street San Francisco California 94158 / US | 02 /
JADHAV, Vasant 4th Floor 1700 Owens Street San Francisco California 94158 / US | 03 /
PICKERING, Victoria 4th Floor 1700 Owens Street San Francisco California 94158 / US | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Hussain, Deeba, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Hussain, Deeba, et al Merck & Co., Inc. Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10710764.1 | 25.03.2010 | WO2010US28629 | Priority number, date | US20090164300P | 27.03.2009 Original published format: US 164300 P | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010111468 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2411018 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/712, A61K31/713, C12N15/113, A61P11/00 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
C12N15/1136 (EP,US);
A61K31/712 (EP,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/14 (EP);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2310/317 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (EP,US);
C12N2310/322, C12N2310/3533 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Title | German: | RNA-INTERFERENZ-VERMITTELTE HEMMUNG DER NERVENWACHSTUMSFAKTOR-BETAKETTEN (NGF9-GEN-EXPRESSION MITTELS SINA (SHORT INTERFERING NUCLEIC ACID) | [2012/05] | English: | RNA INTERFERENCE MEDIATED INHIBITION OF THE NERVE GROWTH FACTOR BETA CHAIN (NGFß) GENE EXPRESSION USING SHORT INTERFERING NUCLEIC ACID (SINA) | [2012/05] | French: | INHIBITION PAR INTERFÉRENCE ARN DE L'EXPRESSION DU GÈNE DE LA CHAÎNE BÊTA DU FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE DES NERFS (NGFß) AU MOYEN D'UN ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE INTERFÉRENT COURT (ANSI) | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 06.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/28] | 22.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2008043561 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,7,33 * page 9 - page 10 * * page 14; sequence 3859 * [I] 4-6,8-19; | [A]WO2004094636 (GALAPAGOS GENOMICS NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-21,26-37 * page 1 - page 3 * * page 209 * | [A] - TSUNODA S ET AL, "Significance of nerve growth factor overexpression and its autocrine loop in oesophageal squamous cell carcinoma", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (200608), vol. 95, no. 3, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 322 - 330, XP002587210 [A] 1-21,26-37 * the whole document * | [A] - ADRIAENSSENS ERIC ET AL, "Nerve growth factor is a potential therapeutic target in breast cancer", CANCER RESEARCH, (200801), vol. 68, no. 2, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 346 - 351, XP002587211 [A] 1-21,26-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-1183 | by applicant | US5998203 | WO0044895 | WO0136646 | WO9932619 | WO0001846 | WO0129058 | WO9907409 | WO0044914 | WO9954459 | US6001311 | US6995259 | US6686463 | US6673918 | US6649751 | US6989442 | WO9323569 | US5889136 | US6008400 | US6111086 | US5902880 | US6146886 | US5624803 | WO9618736 | US6395713 | WO9402595 | WO03047518 | WO03046185 | US6447796 | US2002130430 | WO0053722 | US6528631 | US6335434 | US6235886 | US6153737 | US5214136 | US5138045 | WO9610391 | WO9610390 | WO9610392 | US2003077829 | US2001007666 | US6235310 | US2005287551 | US2005164220 | US2005191627 | US2005118594 | US2005153919 | US2005085486 | US2003158133 | WO0003683 | WO02087541 | US6858224 | US6534484 | US6287591 | US6835395 | US6586410 | US6858225 | US6815432 | US6586001 | US6120798 | US6977223 | US6998115 | US5981501 | US5976567 | US5705385 | US2006019912 | US2006019258 | US2006008909 | US2005255153 | US2005079212 | US2005008689 | US2005064595 | US2005175682 | US2005118253 | US2004071654 | US2005244504 | US2005265961 | WO02066422 | WO02070490 | WO02076933 | WO03024439 | WO03072539 | WO03091204 | WO2004016578 | WO2004022547 | WO2004037807 | WO2004037773 | WO2004037768 | WO2004039762 | WO2004039766 | WO0142193 | WO03042160 | WO02088167 | WO02100879 | WO0212265 | WO0212266 | WO2005005451 | WO03005452 | WO2006072599 | WO2006072600 | WO03082827 | WO9854159 | WO2004005229 | WO2004009017 | WO2004018429 | WO03104195 | WO03082787 | WO03082280 | WO03059899 | WO03101932 | WO0202565 | WO0116128 | WO0066590 | WO03086294 | WO2004026248 | WO03061651 | WO03008277 | WO2006000401 | WO2006000398 | WO2006015870 | WO9313055 | WO9830537 | WO0250021 | WO9534534 | WO9962875 | WO0226722 | US5552438 | WO9916766 | WO9947505 | WO2004024728 | WO2004056823 | WO2004103998 | WO0104118 | WO2004035556 | WO2006045416 | US5286634 | WO03043689 | WO03030989 | US2006062758 | US2006014289 | US2004077540 | WO9421229 | WO9834596 | US4501729 | US7129619 | US7131439 | US2004037780 | US6592904 | US6582728 | US6565885 | WO9632099 | US6119853 | US6179118 | US6315112 | US6352152 | US6390291 | US6679374 | US6360739 | US6431168 | WO2005044354 | US7128897 | US7090830 | US3812854 | WO9211050 | - HUANG; REICHARDT, ANNUAL REVIEW NEUROSCIENCE, (2001), vol. 24, pages 677 - 736 | - FREUND-MICHEL; FROSSARD, PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS, (2008), vol. 117, pages 52 - 76 | - MCDONALD; CHAO, J BIOL CHEM, (1995), vol. 270, pages 19669 - 19672 | - YANO; CHAO, PHARM ACTA HELV, (2000), vol. 7, pages 253 - 260 | - FROSSARD ET AL., EUR J PHARM, (2004), vol. 500, pages 453 - 465 | - NICOL; VASKO, MOLECULAR INTERVENTIONS, (2007), vol. 7, pages 26 - 41 | - HEFTI ET AL., TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (2006), vol. 27, pages 85 - 91 | - JI ET AL., NEURON, (2002), vol. 36, pages 57 - 68 | - TAI; BARANIUK, ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 2, pages 11 - 19 | - CANNING, CURRENT ALLERGY AND ASTHMA REPORTS, (2002), vol. 2, pages 210 - 215 | - UNDEM; CARR, CURRENT ALLERGY AND ASTHMA REPORTS, (2002), vol. 2, pages 159 - 165 | - BELVISI, CURRENT OPINION IN PHARMACOLOGY, (2002), vol. 2, pages 211 - 215 | - OLGART HOGLUND ET AL., EUR RESPIR J, (2002), vol. 20, pages 1110 - 1116 | - VIRCHOW ET AL., AJRCCM, (1998), vol. 158, pages 2002 - 2005 | - KASSEL ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (2001), vol. 31, pages 1432 - 1440 | - SANICO ET AL., AJRCCM 2000, (2000), vol. 161, pages 1631 - 1635 | - O'HANLON ET AL., LARYNGOSCOPE, (2007), vol. 117, pages 1519 - 1527 | - KEH ET AL., LARYNGOSCOPE, (2008), vol. 118, pages 573 - 579 | - DYCK ET AL., NEUROLOGY, (1997), vol. 48, pages 501 - 505 | - HOYLE ET AL., AJRCMB, (1998), vol. 18, pages 149 - 157 | - PATH ET AL., AJRCCM, (2002), vol. 166, pages 818 - 826 | - DE VRIES ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (2002), vol. 32, pages 325 - 328 | - GLAAB ET AL., ALLERGY, (2003), vol. 58, pages 900 - 904 | - VAN RIJSWIJK ET AL., ALLERGY, (2003), vol. 58, pages 754 - 761 | - ELBASHIR ET AL., GENES DEV., (2001), vol. 15, page 188 | - ALLSHIRE, SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 297, pages 1818 - 1819 | - VOLPE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 297, pages 1833 - 1837 | - JENUWEIN, SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 297, pages 2215 - 2218 | - HALL ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 297, pages 2232 - 2237 | - TURNER ET AL., CSH SYMP. QUANT. BIOL., (1987), vol. LII, pages 123 - 133 | - FRIER ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 9373 - 9377 | - TURNER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1987), vol. 109, pages 3783 - 3785 | - SNYDER; GERSTEIN, SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 300, pages 258 - 260 | - AMBROS, NATURE, (2004), vol. 431, pages 350 - 355 | - BARTEL, CELL, (2004), vol. 116, pages 281 - 297 | - CULLEN, VIRUS RESEARCH., (2004), vol. 102, pages 3 - 9 | - HE ET AL., NAT. REV. GENET., (2004), vol. 5, pages 522 - 531 | - YING ET AL., GENE, (2004), vol. 342, pages 25 - 28 | - SETHUPATHY, RNA, (2006), vol. 12, pages 192 - 197 | - EMERICH, DF, CELL TRANSPLANT, (1999), vol. 8, pages 47 - 58 | - BOADO, J. PHARM. SCI., (1998), vol. 87, pages 1308 - 1315 | - TYLER ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1999), vol. 421, pages 280 - 284 | - PARDRIDGE ET AL., PNAS USA., (1995), vol. 92, pages 5592 - 5596 | - BOADO, ADV. DRUG DELIVERY REV., (1995), vol. 15, pages 73 - 107 | - ALDRIAN-HERRADA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1998), vol. 26, pages 4910 - 4916 | - TYLER ET AL., PNAS USA., (1999), vol. 96, pages 7053 - 7058 | - ZAMORE; HALEY, SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 309, pages 1519 - 1524 | - VAUGHN; MARTIENSSEN, SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 309, pages 1525 - 1526 | - ZAMORE ET AL., CELL, (2000), vol. 101, pages 25 - 33 | - BASS, NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 428 - 429 | - ELBASHIR ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 494 - 498 | - VOLPE, SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 297, pages 1833 - 1837 | - HUTVAGNER; ZAMORE, SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 297, pages 2056 - 60 | - MCMANUS ET AL., RNA, (2002), vol. 8, pages 842 - 850 | - REINHART ET AL., GENE & DEV., (2002), vol. 16, pages 1616 - 1626 | - REINHART; BARTEL, SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 297, page 1831 | - VERDEL ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 303, pages 672 - 676 | - PAL-BHADRA ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 303, pages 669 - 672 | - JANOWSKI ET AL., NATURE CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 1, pages 216 - 222 | - MARTINEZ ET AL., CELL, (2002), vol. 110, pages 563 - 574 | - SCHWARZ ET AL., MOLECULAR CELL, (2002), vol. 10, pages 537 - 568 | - LOAKES, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 29, pages 2437 - 2447 | - ELBASHIR ET AL., EMBO J., (2001), vol. 20, pages 6877 - 6888 | - YANG ET AL., PNAS USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 9942 - 9947 | - CALEGARI ET AL., PNAS USA, (2002), vol. 99, page 14236 | - BYRON ET AL., AMBION TECH NOTES, (2009), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 4 - 6 | - KAWASKI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2003), vol. 31, pages 981 - 987 | - KNIGHT; BASS, SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, pages 2269 - 2271 | - ROBERSTON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM, (1969), vol. 243, page 82 | - CARUTHERS ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1992), vol. 211, pages 3 - 19 | - WINCOTT ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1995), vol. 23, pages 2677 - 2684 | - WINCOTT ET AL., METHODS MOL. BIO., (1997), vol. 74, page 59 | - BRENNAN ET AL., BIOTECHNOL BIOENG., (1998), vol. 61, pages 33 - 45 | - USMAN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1987), vol. 109, page 7845 | - SCARINGE ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, page 5433 | - MOORE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, page 9923 | - SHABAROVA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 19, page 4247 | - BELLON ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (1997), vol. 16, page 951 | - BELLON ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1997), vol. 8, page 204 | - IZANT; WEINTRAUB, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 345 | - MCGARRY; LINDQUIST, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., USA, (1986), vol. 83, page 399 | - SCANLON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 10591 - 5 | - KASHANI-SABET ET AL., ANTISENSE RES. DEV., (1992), vol. 2, pages 3 - 15 | - DROPULIC ET AL., J. VIROL., (1992), vol. 66, pages 1432 - 41 | - WEERASINGHE ET AL., J. VIROL., (1991), vol. 65, pages 5531 - 4 | - OJWANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10802 - 6 | - CHEN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, pages 4581 - 9 | - SARVER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, pages 1222 - 1225 | - THOMPSON ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1995), vol. 23, page 2259 | - GOOD ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1997), vol. 4, page 45 | - ELROY-STEIN; MOSS, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U S A, (1990), vol. 87, pages 6743 - 7 | - GAO; HUANG, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1993), vol. 21, pages 2867 - 72 | - LIEBER ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL, (1993), vol. 217, pages 47 - 66 | - ZHOU ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 10, pages 4529 - 37 | - OJWANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U S A, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10802 - 6 | - CHEN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1992), vol. 20, pages 4581 - 9 | - YU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U S A, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6340 - 4 | - L'HUILLIER ET AL., EMBO J., (1992), vol. 11, pages 4411 - 8 | - LISZIEWICZ ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A, (1993), vol. 90, pages 8000 - 4 | - SULLENGER; CECH, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 262, page 1566 | - NOONBERG ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1994), vol. 22, page 2830 | - GOOD ET AL., GENE THER., (1997), vol. 4, page 45 | - PAUL ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 19, page 505 | - MIYAGISHI; TAIRA; 2002, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 19, page 497 | - LEE ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 19, page 500 | - AKHTAR ET AL., TRENDS CELL BIO., (1992), vol. 2, page 139 | - MAURER ET AL., MOL. MEMBR. BIOL., (1999), vol. 16, pages 129 - 140 | - HOFLAND; HUANG, Handb. Exp. Pharmacol., (1999), vol. 137, pages 165 - 192 | - LEE ET AL., A(:S SYMP. SER., (2000), vol. 752, pages 184 - 192 | - GONZALEZ ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1999), vol. 10, pages 1068 - 1074 | - LANDELLS, L.J. ET AL., EUR RESP J, (1998), vol. 12, no. 28 | - TANABE SEIYAKU; FUJI, K. ET AL., J PHARMACOL EXP THER, (1998), vol. 284, no. 1, page 162 | - JABLONOWSKI ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2003), vol. 46, pages 3957 - 3960 | - CULVER, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, MARYANN LIEBERT, INC., PUBLISHERS, (1994), pages 70 - 71 | - WEN ET AL., WORLD J GASTROENTEROL., (2004), vol. 10, pages 244 - 9 | - MURAO ET AL., PHARM RES., (2002), vol. 19, pages 1808 - 14 | - LIU ET AL., GENE THER., (2003), vol. 10, pages 180 - 7 | - HONG ET AL., J PHARM PHARMACOL., (2003), vol. 54, pages 51 - 8 | - HERRMANN ET AL., ARCH VIROL., (2004), vol. 149, pages 1611 - 7 | - MATSUNO ET AL., GENE THER., (2003), vol. 10, pages 1559 - 66 | - HARTMANN ET AL., J. PHAMACOL. EXP. I'HER., (1998), vol. 285, no. 2, pages 920 - 928 | - KRONENWETT ET AL., BLOOD, (1998), vol. 91, no. 3, pages 852 - 862 | - FILION; PHILLIPS, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1997), vol. 1329, no. 2, pages 345 - 356 | - MA; WEI, LEUK. RES., (1996), vol. 20, no. 11/12, pages 925 - 930 | - BONGARTZ ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 22, no. 22, pages 4681 - 8 | - BRAND, CURR. OPIN. MOL. THER., (2001), vol. 3, pages 244 - 8 | - REGNIER ET AL., J. DRUG TARGET, (1998), vol. 5, pages 275 - 89 | - KANIKKANNAN, BIODRUGS, (2002), vol. 16, pages 339 - 47 | - WRAIGHT ET AL., PHARMACOL. THER., (2001), vol. 90, pages 89 - 104 | - PREAT; DUJARDIN, STP PHARMASCIENCES, (2001), vol. 11, pages 57 - 68 | - BRIGHAM ET AL., AM. J. SCI., (1989), vol. 298, page 278 | US20080064014 | US20030444853 | US20040981966 | US20020190359 | US20060353630 | US20060586102 | US20030427160 | US20020201394 | US20030487981 | US20030511009 |