EP2419343 - CENTERING ELEMENT FOR CONTAINER HOLDER ON CONTAINER PROCESSING MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/08] | CENTERING ELEMENT FOR CONTAINER HOLDERS ON CONTAINER PROCESSING MACHINES, CONTAINER HOLDER, AND CONTAINER PROCESSING MACHINES COMPRISING SUCH CONTAINER HOLDERS | ||
[2012/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KHS GmbH Juchostrasse 20 44143 Dortmund / DE | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRÄMER, Klaus Dinnendahlweg 11 44267 Dortmund / DE | 02 /
DECKERT, Lutz Visbystrasse 23 45721 Haltern am See / DE | [2012/08] | Application number, filing date | 10710809.4 | 25.03.2010 | WO2010EP01872 | Priority number, date | DE20091016321 | 06.04.2009 Original published format: DE102009016321 | [2012/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010115521 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2419343 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2419343 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65C9/04 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
B65C9/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZENTRIERELEMENT FÜR BEHÄLTERTRÄGER AN BEHÄLTERBEHANDLUNGSMASCHINEN | [2012/42] | English: | CENTERING ELEMENT FOR CONTAINER HOLDER ON CONTAINER PROCESSING MACHINES | [2012/42] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CENTRAGE POUR SUPPORTS DE RÉCIPIENTS SUR DES MACHINES DE TRAITEMENT DE RÉCIPIENTS | [2012/42] |
Former [2012/08] | ZENTRIERELEMENT FÜR BEHÄLTERTRÄGER AN BEHÄLTERBEHANDLUNGSMASCHINEN, BEHÄLTERTRÄGER SOWIE BEHÄLTERBEHANDLUNGSMASCHINEN MIT DERARTIGEN BEHÄLTERTRÄGERN | ||
Former [2012/08] | CENTERING ELEMENT FOR CONTAINER HOLDERS ON CONTAINER PROCESSING MACHINES, CONTAINER HOLDER, AND CONTAINER PROCESSING MACHINES COMPRISING SUCH CONTAINER HOLDERS | ||
Former [2012/08] | ÉLÉMENT DE CENTRAGE POUR SUPPORTS DE RÉCIPIENTS SUR DES MACHINES DE TRAITEMENT DE RÉCIPIENTS, SUPPORTS DE RÉCIPIENTS ET MACHINES DE TRAITEMENT DE RÉCIPIENTS MUNIES DE TELS SUPPORTS DE RÉCIPIENTS | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 17.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2010 | CY | 23.01.2013 | CZ | 23.01.2013 | DK | 23.01.2013 | EE | 23.01.2013 | FI | 23.01.2013 | HR | 23.01.2013 | LT | 23.01.2013 | LV | 23.01.2013 | MK | 23.01.2013 | MT | 23.01.2013 | NL | 23.01.2013 | RO | 23.01.2013 | SE | 23.01.2013 | SI | 23.01.2013 | SK | 23.01.2013 | SM | 23.01.2013 | TR | 23.01.2013 | IE | 25.03.2013 | LU | 25.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | BG | 23.04.2013 | NO | 23.04.2013 | GR | 24.04.2013 | ES | 04.05.2013 | IS | 23.05.2013 | PT | 23.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 25.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 25.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 25.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 25.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 25.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 23.01.2013 | |
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 23.01.2013 | |
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 23.01.2013 | |
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 23.01.2013 | |
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | FI | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
NO | 23.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1218930 (KRONSEDER HERMANN) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]DE1761059 (KRONSEDER HERMANN) [X] 1,2,5-7,10,14,15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3922075 (ETI TEC MASCHINENBAU [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, lines 7-33 *; | [X]DE20114062U (KHS MASCH & ANLAGENBAU AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,10-13,15 * page 3, lines 4-35 * * figures 1-7 *; | [X]EP1251074 (SIG ALFA S P A [IT]) [X] 1,10,14,15 * figure 3 * * paragraphs [0054] - [0055] - [ 0060] - [0061] *; | [X]EP1657162 (KHS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,10-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [ 0006] - [0019] * * figures 1-5 * |