EP2411600 - FORMWORK FOR BUILDING FLOOR SLABS AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faresin Building Division S.p.A. Via Calcara, 61 36042 Breganze (VI) / IT | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARESIN, Guido Via Ca' Molin 11 I-36061 Bassano Del Grappa / IT | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (IT) Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10710850.8 | 25.03.2010 | WO2010EP53956 | Priority number, date | IT2009PD00067 | 27.03.2009 Original published format: IT PD20090067 | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010108997 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2411600 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E04G11/38 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
E04G11/38 (EP);
E04G21/3204 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Title | German: | SCHALUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BODENPLATTEN UND DERGLEICHEN | [2012/05] | English: | FORMWORK FOR BUILDING FLOOR SLABS AND THE LIKE | [2012/05] | French: | COFFRAGE POUR LA FABRICATION DE DALLES DE PLANCHER ET ANALOGUE | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 05.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/30] | 17.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   21.07.2014 | 31.03.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2140725 (FEREM) [Y] 1-3,5 * page 1, lines 1-17 ** page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 6; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0049599 (HERRICK GEORGE) [X] 1 * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 8; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1375781 (ULMA C Y E S COOP [ES]) [Y] 1-3,5 * figures 1,13 *; | [X]JP2006183313 (NIPPON RITTAI CHUSHAJO KAIHATS) [X] 1 * figures 19,27 * |