EP2409340 - COLOR ADJUSTING ARRANGEMENTS AND ILLUMINATION DEVICE WITH THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/04] | COLOR ADJUSTING ARRANGEMENT | ||
[2019/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signify Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/11] |
Former [2018/50] | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2016/34] | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAGT, Hendrik, J., B. c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/24] |
Former [2012/04] | 01 /
JAGT, Hendrik, J., B. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus, et al Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/24] |
Former [2012/04] | Van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 10710905.0 | 15.03.2010 | [2019/24] | WO2010IB51097 | Priority number, date | EP20090155610 | 19.03.2009 Original published format: EP 09155610 | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010106478 | Date: | 23.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2409340 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2409340 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/50, // H01L33/46, H01L25/075, F21Y115/10 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
H01L33/504 (EP,KR,US);
H01L25/0753 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/44 (KR);
H01L33/60 (KR);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/04] | H01L33/50, F21Y101/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FARBEINSTELLUNG ANORDNUNGEN UND BELEUCHTUNGSEINRICHTUNG MIT DEN GLEICHEN | [2019/03] | English: | COLOR ADJUSTING ARRANGEMENTS AND ILLUMINATION DEVICE WITH THE SAME | [2019/03] | French: | ARRANGEMENTS AJUSTEURS DE COULEUR ET DISPOSITIF D'ILLUMINATION AVEC CEUX-CI | [2019/03] |
Former [2012/04] | FARBEINSTELLUNGSANORDNUNG | ||
Former [2012/04] | COLOR ADJUSTING ARRANGEMENT | ||
Former [2012/04] | SYSTÈME DE RÉGLAGE DE COULEUR | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 07.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2010 | AT | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | CZ | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | ES | 12.06.2019 | FI | 12.06.2019 | HR | 12.06.2019 | IT | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | LV | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MK | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | NL | 12.06.2019 | PL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | SE | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | SM | 12.06.2019 | TR | 12.06.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | NO | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | IS | 12.11.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.03.2010 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
MT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5813752 (SINGER BARRY [US], et al) [A] 7 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 8; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US6791259 (STOKES EDWARD BRITTAIN [US], et al) [A] 9 * column 1, lines 10-15 ** column 6, lines 2-5; figures 5,7 *; | [XYI]US2006091779 (TAKEDA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,8,10-14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] , [0008] , [0010] , [0016] , [0025] - [0027] - [0030] , [0039] - [0041] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0062] - [0067]; figures 3-6 * [Y] 5-7,15 [I] 9; | [A]US2008079015 (KRUMMACHER BENJAMIN CLAUS [DE]) [A] 5 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0008] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0041] - [0048]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]WO2008040283 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 7 * page 1, lines 9-18 * * page 2, lines 19-28 * * page 4, lines 7-30 * * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 21 * * page 17, lines 4-30 * * page 20, line 6 - page 24, line 9; figures 1A-B * * page 24, line 28 - page 26, line 8 *; | [YD]WO2008044171 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [YD] 15 * page 1, lines 22-28 * * page 2, lines 5-27 * * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 3 * * page 4, lines 16-28; figure 1 * * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 17; figure 4 * * page 9, lines 1-6 *; | [Y]US2009057699 (BASIN GRIGORIY [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] - [0006] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0037]; figures 2-4 * |