EP2415208 - DYNAMIC LINE MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Telecommunications public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROOT, Christopher, Marcus Stone House Felsham Road Bradfield St. George Bury St. Edmunds Suffolk IP30 0AB / GB | 02 /
PICKERING, Ashley 62 Belle Vue Road Ipswich Suffolk IP4 2RD / GB | 03 /
LINNEY, Trevor, Philip 3 Fieldfare Close Stowmarket Suffolk IP14 5UJ / GB | 04 /
EVERETT, Philip, Antony 4 Marbled White Drive Pinewood Ipswich Suffolk IP8 3TL / GB | 05 /
COOK, John, Wolsey 625 Felixstowe Road Ipswich Suffolk IP3 8SZ / GB | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Simeon Paul BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Williamson, Simeon Paul British Telecommunications plc Intellectual Property Department PP C5A - BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/06] | Williamson, Simeon Paul British Telecommunications plc Intellectual Property Department PP C5A - BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10711070.2 | 19.03.2010 | WO2010GB00504 | Priority number, date | EP20090250968 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: EP 09250968 | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010112809 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2415208 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2415208 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04L12/24, H04L12/28, H04M3/30 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
H04L41/32 (EP,US);
H04L12/2878 (EP,US);
H04L43/0811 (EP,US);
H04M3/304 (EP,US);
H04L41/0654 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/06] | H04L12/24, H04Q11/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE LINIENVERWALTUNG | [2014/20] | English: | DYNAMIC LINE MANAGEMENT | [2012/06] | French: | GESTION DYNAMIQUE DE LIGNE | [2014/24] |
Former [2012/06] | DYNAMISCHES LINEMANAGEMENT | ||
Former [2012/06] | GESTION DE LIGNE DYNAMIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 28.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2010 | AT | 22.10.2014 | BE | 22.10.2014 | BG | 22.10.2014 | CY | 22.10.2014 | CZ | 22.10.2014 | DK | 22.10.2014 | EE | 22.10.2014 | FI | 22.10.2014 | HR | 22.10.2014 | LT | 22.10.2014 | LV | 22.10.2014 | MC | 22.10.2014 | MK | 22.10.2014 | MT | 22.10.2014 | NL | 22.10.2014 | PL | 22.10.2014 | RO | 22.10.2014 | SE | 22.10.2014 | SI | 22.10.2014 | SK | 22.10.2014 | SM | 22.10.2014 | TR | 22.10.2014 | NO | 22.01.2015 | GR | 23.01.2015 | IS | 22.02.2015 | PT | 23.02.2015 | LU | 19.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/46] | HU | 19.03.2010 | |
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 22.10.2014 | ||
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 19.03.2010 | |
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 22.10.2014 | |
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 22.10.2014 | |
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 22.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1995942 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0004] - [0012] - [0023] - [0025] - [0035] , [0066] , [0067] *; | [X]WO2007012867 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 30 * * page 6, line 21 - page 8, line 26 *; | [X]US5889470 (KAYCEE MANU [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 2, line 46 - column 5, line 65 *; | [A] - "Dynamic Line Management for Digital Subscriber Lines", INTERNET CITATION, URL: http://www1.alcatel-lucent.com/com/en/appcontent/apl/18812_DLM_twp_tc m172-228691635.pdf, (20070712), XP002442256 [A] 1-11 * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line END * | [A] - "TR-130 xDSL EMS to NMS Interface Functinal Requirements", BROADBAND FORUM, (200702), URL: http://www.broadband-forum.org/technical/download/TR-130.pdf, (20090603), XP002530390 [A] 1 * paragraph [0006] * | by applicant | WO2007012867 | EP1995942 | US5889470 |