EP2408447 - PRENYLATED BISPHOSPHONATES AS ANTI-TUBERCULOSIS AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Iowa Research Foundation Iowa Centers for Enterprise 2660 University Capitol Centre Iowa City, IA 52242-5500 / US | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIEMER, David, F. 2660 University Capitol Centre Iowa City, Iowa 52242-5500 / US | 02 /
BARNEY, Rocky, J. 2660 University Capitol Centre Iowa City, Iowa 52242-5500 / US | 03 /
HOHL, Raymond, J. 2660 University Capitol Centre Iowa City, Iowa 52242-5500 / US | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10711117.1 | 22.03.2010 | WO2010US28187 | Priority number, date | US20090162145P | 20.03.2009 Original published format: US 162145 P | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010108190 | Date: | 23.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2408447 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/404, A61K31/663, A61P31/06, A61K9/20 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
A61K31/663 (EP,US);
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K9/008 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Title | German: | PRENYLIERTE BISPHOSPHONATE ALS ANTI-TUBERKULOSE-MITTEL | [2012/04] | English: | PRENYLATED BISPHOSPHONATES AS ANTI-TUBERCULOSIS AGENTS | [2012/04] | French: | BISPHOSPHONATES PRÉNYLÉS EN TANT QU'AGENTS ANTITUBERCULEUX | [2012/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 07.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/10] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9420508 (EISAI CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 23,25 * examples 217, 224 *; | [A]DE19902924 (JOMAA HASSAN [DE]) [A] 1-32 * page 1, line 19 - line 60 ** page 5, line 59 - line 60 *; | [X]US6696427 (JOMAA HASSAN [DE]) [X] 1-11,15,18,19,21,23,25-32 * column 1, line 58 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 35 * * claims 1-4 *; | [Y]WO2005021708 (UNIV MARYLAND BIOTECH INST [US], et al) [Y] 1-32 * abstract * * claims 1,2,19 * * page 15, line 37 - line 40 *; | [Y]US2006287257 (STOCKEL RICHARD F [US]) [Y] 1-32 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * claims 1,2,7 *; | [Y] - DUARTE RAFAEL ET AL, "Mycobacterium tuberculosis induces apoptosis in gamma/delta T lymphocytes from patients with advanced clinical forms of active tuberculosis", CLINICAL AND DIAGNOSTIC LABORATORY IMMUNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 1071-412X, pages 14 - 18, XP002585007 [Y] 1-32 * abstract * | by applicant | US4559157 | US4608392 | US4820508 | US4938949 | US4992478 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1980), vol. 16, page 61,424 | - GALMARINI CM ET AL., INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, (2003), vol. 107, no. 1, pages 149 - 154 | - WAGNER, C. R. ET AL., MEDICINAL RESEARCH REVIEWS, (2000), vol. 20, pages 417 - 451 | - MCGUIGAN, C. ET AL., ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 17, pages 311 - 321 | - CHAPMAN, H. ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES, NUCLEOTIDES & NUCLEIC ACIDS, (2001), vol. 20, pages 1085 - 1090 | - CRICK, D.C.; SCHULBACH, M.C.; ZINK, E.E. ET AL., JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 182, no. 20, pages 5771 - 5778 | - SASSETTI, C. M.; BOYD, D. H.; RUBIN, E. J., MOL. MICROBIOL., (2003), vol. 48, no. 1, pages 77 - 84 | - MATSUDA ET AL., "Quantitative structure-activity studies of pyrethroids. 17. Physicochemical substituent effects of substituted benzyl esters of kadethric acid on symptomatic and neurophysiological activities", PESTICIDE BIOCHEMISTRY AND PHYSIOLOGY, (1989), vol. 35, no. 3, pages 300 - 314 |