Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8900904 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2014 | B2 | US2012091551 | 19.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009013112 | 13.03.2009 | WO2010EP52923 | 08.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5507585B | Global Dossier | 28.05.2014 | B2 | JP2012520557 | 06.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009013112 | 13.03.2009 | WO2010EP52923 | 08.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2406825 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2017 | B1 | EP2406825 | 18.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009013112 | 13.03.2009 | WO2010EP52923 | 08.03.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010102985 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009013112 | 13.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102009013112 | 16.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009013112 | 13.03.2009 |