EP2417674 - PLUG CONNECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOWOTNICK, Jens Diebsteigle 19 72764 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
GRADTKE, Oliver Schoenbergweg 14 72766 Reutlingen / DE | 03 /
LAUSMANN, Matthias Wunnensteinweg 3 71711 Murr / DE | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/07] | Application number, filing date | 10711194.0 | 19.03.2010 | [2015/49] | WO2010EP53587 | Priority number, date | DE20091002242 | 07.04.2009 Original published format: DE102009002242 | [2012/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010115693 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2417674 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2417674 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/72, H01R13/502, H01R12/88, H01R13/66 | [2015/37] | CPC: |
H01R12/721 (EP,US);
H01R12/88 (EP,US);
H01R13/502 (EP,US);
H01R13/6658 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/07] | H01R13/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STECKVERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2012/07] | English: | PLUG CONNECTION DEVICE | [2012/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION | [2012/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 22.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2010 | BG | 02.12.2015 | CY | 02.12.2015 | CZ | 02.12.2015 | DK | 02.12.2015 | EE | 02.12.2015 | ES | 02.12.2015 | FI | 02.12.2015 | HR | 02.12.2015 | LT | 02.12.2015 | LV | 02.12.2015 | MC | 02.12.2015 | MK | 02.12.2015 | MT | 02.12.2015 | NL | 02.12.2015 | PL | 02.12.2015 | RO | 02.12.2015 | SE | 02.12.2015 | SI | 02.12.2015 | SK | 02.12.2015 | SM | 02.12.2015 | TR | 02.12.2015 | NO | 02.03.2016 | GR | 03.03.2016 | AT | 19.03.2016 | GB | 19.03.2016 | IE | 19.03.2016 | LU | 19.03.2016 | BE | 31.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | IS | 02.04.2016 | PT | 04.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.03.2010 | |
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
MT | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
AT | 19.03.2016 | ||
GB | 19.03.2016 | ||
IE | 19.03.2016 | ||
LU | 19.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.03.2010 | |
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
MT | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
AT | 19.03.2016 | ||
GB | 19.03.2016 | ||
IE | 19.03.2016 | ||
LU | 19.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MT | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
AT | 19.03.2016 | ||
GB | 19.03.2016 | ||
IE | 19.03.2016 | ||
LU | 19.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
GB | 19.03.2016 | ||
IE | 19.03.2016 | ||
LU | 19.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IE | 19.03.2016 | ||
LU | 19.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
LU | 19.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
LU | 19.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US7270557 (YU HONG-CHI [TW]) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 39 * [Y] 9-12; | [Y]US2008305680 (LITTLE TERRANCE F [US], et al) [Y] 9-12 * paragraph [0042] *; | [A]US2006035492 (SEKIDO TOSHIHISA [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10350233 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004253849 (KURIBAYASHI NOBUKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3925648 |