EP2405896 - GLYCEROSOMES AND USE THEREOF IN PHARMACEUTICAL AND COSMETIC PREPARATIONS FOR TOPICAL APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prigen S.r.l. Via Anita Garibaldi 1 20052 Monza (MI) / IT | [2012/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZARU, Marco c/o Prigen S.r.l. Via Anita Garibaldi 1 I-20052 Monza (MI) / IT | 02 /
MANCA, Maria Letizia c/o Prigen S.r.l. Via Anita Garibaldi 1 I-20052 Monza (MI) / IT | 03 /
FADDA, Anna Maria c/o Prigen S.r.l. Via Anita Garibaldi 1 I-20052 Monza (MI) / IT | 04 /
ORSINI, Gaetano c/o Prigen S.r.l. Via Anita Garibaldi 1 I-20052 Monza (MI) / IT | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Banfi, Paolo Bianchetti & Minoja with Trevisan & Cuonzo IPS Srl Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Banfi, Paolo Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10711328.4 | 08.03.2010 | WO2010EP01428 | Priority number, date | IT2009MI00350 | 10.03.2009 Original published format: IT MI20090350 | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010102770 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2405896 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2405896 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/18 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLYCEROSOMES UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN PHARMAZEUTISCHEN UND KOSMETISCHEN ZUBEREITUNGEN ZUR TOPISCHEN VERABREICHUNG | [2012/03] | English: | GLYCEROSOMES AND USE THEREOF IN PHARMACEUTICAL AND COSMETIC PREPARATIONS FOR TOPICAL APPLICATION | [2012/03] | French: | GLYCÉROSOMES ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS DES PRÉPARATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES ET COSMÉTIQUES POUR APPLICATION TOPIQUE | [2012/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 05.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2010 | AT | 07.05.2014 | BE | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | HR | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | LV | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | MK | 07.05.2014 | MT | 07.05.2014 | NL | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | SM | 07.05.2014 | NO | 07.08.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 08.03.2010 | |
AT | 07.05.2014 | ||
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MK | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
TR | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 08.03.2010 | |
AT | 07.05.2014 | ||
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MK | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 08.03.2010 | |
AT | 07.05.2014 | ||
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9218103 (PHARES PHARMA HOLLAND [NL]) [X] 1-11 * page 12 - page 14; example 2 *; | [XI]EP1013268 (ROHTO PHARMA [JP]) [X] 1,3-11 * column 8 - column 9; example 1 * [I] 2; | [A]US2006099244 (GUILFORD F T [US]) [A] 1-11* page 5 - page 6; examples 2,3 * | Examination | US6348215 | by applicant | US4235871 | WO9218103 | WO9218193 | US5716638 | EP1013268 | US2006099244 | - BANGHAM ET AL., "The action of steroids and streptolysin S on the permeability of phospholipid structures to cations", J. MOL. BIOL., (1965), vol. 13, pages 238 - 252 | - CEVC G; BLUME G, "Lipid vesicles penetrate into intact skin owing to the transdermal osmotic gradients and hydration force", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1992), vol. 1104, pages 226 - 232 | - CEVC G; GEBAUER D, "Hydration-driven transport of deformable lipid vesicles through fine pores and skin barrier", BIOPHYS. J., (2003), vol. 84, pages 1010 - 1024 | - CEVC G., "Lipid vesicles and other colloids as drug carrier on the skin", ADV.DRUG DELIV.REV., (2004), vol. 56, pages 675 - 711 | - EL MAGHRABY G.M ET AL., "Can drug bearing liposomes penetrate intact skin?", J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (2006), vol. 58, pages 415 - 429 | - ELSAYED MMA ET AL., "Deformable liposomes and ethosomes: Mechanism of enhanced skin delivery", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, (2006), vol. 322, pages 60 - 66 | - IMURA T, "Preparation and physicochemical properties of various soybean lecithin liposomes using supercritical reverse phase evaporation method", COLLOIDS AND SURFACE B : BIOINTERFACES., (2002), vol. 27, pages 133 - 140 | - KIRBY C; GREGORIADIS G, "Dehydration-rehydration vesicles (DRV): A new method for high yield drug entrapment in liposomes", BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1984), vol. 11, pages 979 - 984 | - LAVON I; KOST J, "Ultrasound and transdermal drug delivery", DRUG DISCOV. TODAY, (2004), vol. 9, pages 670 - 676 | - LICHTENBERG D; BARENHOLZ Y, "Liposomes: preparation, characterization and preservation", METH. BIOCHEM. ANAL., (1988), vol. 33, pages 337 - 461 | - MANOSROI A ET AL., "Characterization of vesicles prepared with various non ionic surfactants mixed with cholesterol", COLLOIDS AND SURFACE B: BIOINTERFACES, (2003), vol. 30, pages 129 - 138 | - MELE S ET AL., "Monolein based liquid crystals to form long-term stable emulsion", COLLOIDS AND SURFACE A PHYSICOCHEM ENG. ASPECTS, (2003), vol. 228, pages 57 - 63 | - MEZEI M; GULASEKHARAM V, "Liposomes-a selective drug delivery system for topical route of administration. 1. Lotion dosage form", PHARM. SCI., (1980), vol. 82, no. 1, pages 17 - 21 | - MEZEI M., Liposomes in topical application of drugs. Liposomes as Drugs Carriers : Recent Trends and Progress, WILEY J. & SONS, (1988), pages 663 - 677 | - PICK U., "Liposomes with a large trapping capacity prepared by freezing and thawing of sonicated phospholipid mixtures", ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1981), vol. 212, pages 186 - 194 | - SINICO C. ET AL., "Liposomal incorporation of Artemisia Arborescens L. essential oil and in vitro antiviral activity", EUR. J. PHARM. BIOPHARM., (2005), vol. 59, pages 161 - 168 | - SINICO C, "Liposomes as carriers for dermal delivery of tretinoin: in vitro evaluation of drug permeation and vesicles skin interaction", J. CONTR. REL, (2005), vol. 103, pages 123 - 126 | - MANCONI, "Niosomes as carriers for tretinoin III. A study into in vitro cutaneous delivery of vesicles-incorporated tretinoin", INT. J. PHARM., (2006), vol. 311, pages 11 - 19 | - SKOZA F; PAPAHADJOPOULOS D, "Comparative properties and methods of preparation of lipid vesicles (liposomes)", ANNU. REV. BIOPHYS. BIOENG., (1980), vol. 9, pages 467 - 508 | - TOUITOU E ET AL., "Ethosomes - novel vesicular carriers for enhanced delivery: characterization and skin penetration properties", J.CONTROL.REL., (2000), vol. 65, pages 403 - 418 | - VEMURI S; RHODES CT, "Preparation and characteration of liposomes as therapeutic delivery systems: a review", PHARM. ACTA HELV., (1995), vol. 70, pages 95 - 111 | - WILLIAMS AC; BARRY BW, "Skin absorption enhancers", CRIT. REV. THER. DRUG CARR. SYS., (1992), vol. 9, pages 305 - 53 | - WOODLE MC; PAPAHDJOPOULOS D, "Liposome preparation and size characterization", METH. ENZYMOL., (1989), vol. 171, pages 193 - 217 |