EP2404364 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CONDUCTOR ROD FOR THE STATOR OF AN ELECTRIC MACHINE, AND DEVICE FOR DENSIFYING THE INSULATION OF A CONDUCTOR ROD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/02] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CONDUCTOR ROD FOR THE STATOR OF AN ELECTRIC MACHINE, IN PARTICULAR A GENERATOR, AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A CONDUCTOR ROD | ||
[2014/03] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAFARI ZADEH, Hossein Högernweg 29 5504 Othmarsingen / CH | [2014/04] |
Former [2012/02] | 01 /
SAFARI ZADEH, Hossein Högernweg 29 CH-5504 Othmarsingen / CH | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/02] | Application number, filing date | 10711609.7 | 18.02.2010 | WO2010EP52025 | Priority number, date | CH20090030309 | 02.03.2009 Original published format: CH 303092009 | [2012/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010100031 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2404364 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/12 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
H02K15/12 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5313 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LEITERSTABS FÜR DEN STATOR EINER ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE, SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERDICHTUNG DER ISOLIERUNG EINES LEITERSTABS | [2014/03] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CONDUCTOR ROD FOR THE STATOR OF AN ELECTRIC MACHINE, AND DEVICE FOR DENSIFYING THE INSULATION OF A CONDUCTOR ROD | [2014/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE BARRE CONDUCTRICE POUR LE STATOR D'UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE, ET DISPOSITIF POUR DENSIFIER L'ISOLATION D'UNE BARRE CONDUCTRICE | [2014/03] |
Former [2012/02] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LEITERSTABS FÜR DEN STATOR EINER ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE, INSBESONDERE EINES GENERATORS, SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LEITERSTABS | ||
Former [2012/02] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CONDUCTOR ROD FOR THE STATOR OF AN ELECTRIC MACHINE, IN PARTICULAR A GENERATOR, AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A CONDUCTOR ROD | ||
Former [2012/02] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE BARRE CONDUCTRICE POUR LE STATOR D'UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE, NOTAMMENT D'UN GÉNÉRATEUR, ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'UNE BARRE CONDUCTRICE | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 02.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | 26.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19637983 (MICAFIL VAKUUMTECHNIK AG [CH]) [X] 1,3-7 * column 3, line 5 - column 5, line 23; figure - *; | [X]EP0978929 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-7* column 5, line 32 - column 7, line 6; figure - *; | [X]DE19962290 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-7 * column 1, line 62 - column 3, line 37; figure - * |