EP2413715 - PREVENTION OF EXTRACT DARKENING AND MALODOR FORMATION DURING SOLUBILIZATION OF PLANT CELL WALL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 1411 Copenhagen K / DK | [2016/20] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 Postboks 17 1001 Copenhagen K. / DK | ||
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Dupont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 P.O. Box 17 1001 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2012/06] | For all designated states Danisco A/S Langebrogade 1 PO Box 17 1001 Copenhagen K / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKKELSEN, René Skydebanevej 4D DK-8660 Skanderborg / DK | 02 /
SØRENSEN, Jens Frisbæk Nordvestpassagen 93 DK-8200 Århus N / DK | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2012/06] | Inspicos A/S Kogle Allé 2 P.O. Box 45 2970 Hørsholm / DK | Application number, filing date | 10711882.0 | 29.03.2010 | [2017/43] | WO2010EP54104 | Priority number, date | EP20090156890 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: EP 09156890 | US20090165195P | 31.03.2009 Original published format: US 165195 P | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010115754 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2413715 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2413715 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A21D2/22, A21D8/04, C12F3/08, A21D2/36, A21D13/02, C12F3/02, C11B3/00, C12F3/10, A23L7/104 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
A21D8/042 (EP,CN,US);
A23L7/104 (EP,BR,US);
A21D2/22 (BR,CN);
A21D13/02 (EP,US);
A21D2/36 (EP,US);
A21D8/04 (BR);
A23L7/107 (EP,BR,US);
C11B3/003 (EP,US);
C12F3/08 (BR);
C12F3/10 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/06] | A23L1/105, A21D2/22, A21D8/04, C12F3/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERMEIDUNG DER BRÄUNUNG UND DER BILDUNG VON FEHLGERUCH WÄHREND DER SOLUBILISIERUNG VON PFLANZENZELLWÄNDEN | [2017/22] | English: | PREVENTION OF EXTRACT DARKENING AND MALODOR FORMATION DURING SOLUBILIZATION OF PLANT CELL WALL MATERIAL | [2012/06] | French: | Prévention d'assombrissement et des mauvaises odeurs pendant la solubilisation de paroi cellulaire végétale. | [2017/22] |
Former [2012/06] | VORBEUGUNG GEGEN DAS DUNKELWERDEN VON EXTRAKTEN UND DIE BILDUNG VON SCHLECHTEM GERUCH WÄHREND DER SOLUBILISIERUNG VON PFLANZLICHEM ZELLWANDMATERIAL | ||
Former [2012/06] | PRÉVENTION DU NOIRCISSEMENT D'EXTRAIT ET DE LA FORMATION DE MAUVAISES ODEURS AU COURS DE LA SOLUBILISATION D'UNE PAROI CELLULAIRE VÉGÉTALE | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 17.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP17185191.8 / EP3269248 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2010 | AT | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | DK | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | ES | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | HR | 25.10.2017 | IT | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | LV | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | MK | 25.10.2017 | NL | 25.10.2017 | PL | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | SE | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | SM | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | BG | 25.01.2018 | NO | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | IE | 29.03.2018 | LU | 29.03.2018 | MT | 29.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 29.03.2010 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 29.03.2018 | ||
LU | 29.03.2018 | ||
MT | 29.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 29.03.2018 | ||
LU | 29.03.2018 | ||
MT | 29.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 29.03.2018 | ||
LU | 29.03.2018 | ||
MT | 29.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 29.03.2018 | ||
LU | 29.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 29.03.2018 | ||
LU | 29.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 29.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 25.10.2017 | |
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 25.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0468731 (ORIENTAL YEAST CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JPH06284852 (NIPPON FLOUR MILLS); | [XYI]WO0121012 (GOODMAN FIELDER LTD [AU], et al); | [XYI]US2004018256 (DREESE PATRICK C [US], et al); | [XYI]US2004033291 (BURGERMEISTER RENE [CH], et al); | [XYI]EP1785192 (BARILLA FLLI G & R [IT]); | Examination | - K Poutanen, "Enzymes: An important tool in the improvement of the quality of cereal foods", Trends in Food Science & Technology, doi:10.1016/S0924-2244(97)01063-7, (19970101), pages 300 - 306, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0924224497010637, XP055158799 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-2244(97)01063-7 | by applicant | EP0130064 | WO9119782 | WO9201793 | US5094951 | WO9217573 | WO9219640 | EP0562003 | WO9421785 | WO9639851 | EP0869167 | EP0977869 | WO0032758 | WO0061771 | US6165761 | WO0139602 | WO0142433 | WO0200852 | EP1193314 | WO02095014 | WO02094123 | WO03020923 | WO03097835 | WO03099016 | EP1433852 | WO2004064987 | WO2005003339 | WO2005074656 | EP1722636 | WO2008000050 | WO2008087167 | US20060832511 | US20070941251 |