EP2403876 - AN ASSAY FOR DETECTING VITAMIN D AND ANTIBODIES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axis-Shield Diagnostics Limited Luna Place The Technology Park Dundee, Tayside DD2 1XA / GB | [2012/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAWLOR, Margaret 22 Grangehill Drive Monifieth Dundee DD5 4RH / GB | 02 /
PRITCHARD, David 41 Abbey Road Scone Perthshire PH2 6LL / GB | 03 /
BLACK, Murdo Cowiehill 72 Lour Road Forfar DD8 2AZ / GB | 04 /
O̸RNING, Lars Askeladdveien 6 N-Oslo / NO | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Ablett, Graham Keith Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London, W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Ablett, Graham Keith Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London, W1U 6FQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10711924.0 | 02.03.2010 | WO2010GB50368 | Priority number, date | GB20090003469 | 02.03.2009 Original published format: GB 0903469 | [2012/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010100487 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2403876 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, C07K16/44 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
C07K16/44 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/82 (KR);
C07K2317/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Title | German: | ASSAY ZUM NACHWEIS VON VITAMIN D UND ANTIKÖRPER DAFÜR | [2012/02] | English: | AN ASSAY FOR DETECTING VITAMIN D AND ANTIBODIES THEREFOR | [2012/02] | French: | DOSAGE POUR LA DÉTECTION DE LA VITAMINE D ET ANTICORPS CORRESPONDANTS | [2012/02] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 24.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/27] | 01.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007140962 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008092917 (IMMUNDIAGNOSTIK AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008138783 (NORDIC BOISCIENCE AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [XI] - BROWN W B ET AL, "Characteristics of antisera to antigenic forms of 1,25-dihydroxycholecalciferol", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0009-8981(86)90043-4, vol. 159, no. 2, ISSN 0009-8981, (19860915), pages 111 - 121, (19860915), XP023393401 [X] 1-4,7-15,17 * page 119; tables I-VI * [I] 5,6,16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-8981(86)90043-4 | [I] - VERBOVEN CHRISTEL ET AL, "A structural basis for the unique binding features of the human vitamin D-binding protein.", NATURE STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (200202), vol. 9, no. 2, ISSN 1072-8368, pages 131 - 136, XP007913123 [I] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nsb754 | [A] - HOLLIS BRUCE W, "Assessment of circulating 25(OH)D and 1,25(OH)2D: emergence as clinically important diagnostic tools.", NUTRITION REVIEWS AUG 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17867378, (200708), vol. 65, no. 8 Pt 2, ISSN 0029-6643, pages S87 - S90, XP007913126 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1301/nr.2007.aug.S87�S90 | [A] - ZERWEKH JOSEPH E, "Blood biomarkers of vitamin D status", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, (200804), vol. 87, no. 4, ISSN 0002-9165, pages 1087S - 1091S, XP007913097 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - ZERWEKH J E, "THE MEASUREMENT OF VITAMIN D: ANALYTICAL ASPECTS", ANNALS OF CLINICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, BRITISH MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1258/0004563041201464, (20040701), vol. 41, no. PART 04, ISSN 0004-5632, pages 272 - 281, XP008056470 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1258/0004563041201464 | [A] - OSAWA M ET AL, "Epitope analysis of monoclonal antibodies to human GC globulin (vitamin D-binding protein)", BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1080/15216549800201312, vol. 44, no. 2, ISSN 1039-9712, (19980201), pages 293 - 303, (20080117), XP008122418 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/15216549800201312 | by applicant | - G. KOHLER; C. MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - Methods in Enzymology, (1981), page 729B | - BARBAS C.F.; LERNER, R.A., "Combinatorial immunoglobulin libraries on the surface of phage (phabs). Rapid selection of antigen-specific Fabs", METHODS: A COMPANION TO METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1991), vol. 2, pages 119 - 124 | - LE GALL F. ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1999), vol. 453, pages 164 - 168 | - KORTT A.A. ET AL., BIOMOLECULAR ENGINEERING, (2001), vol. 18, pages 95 - 108 | - SUZUKI M; OZAWA F; SUGIMOTO W; ASO S., ANAL BIOANAL CHEM, (2002), vol. 372, pages 301 - 304 | - PEARSON J E; KANE J W; PETRAKI-KALLIOTI I; GILL A; VADGAMA P, J IMMUNOL METHODS, (1998), vol. 221, pages 81 - 94 | - WEISCH W; KLEIN C; VON SCHICKFUS M; HUNKLINGER S, ANAL CHEM, (1996), vol. 68, pages 2000 - 20004 | - CHOU S F; HSU W L; HUANG J M; CHEN C Y, CLIN CHEM, (2002), vol. 48, pages 913 - 918 |