EP2413882 - DUAL ACTION DENTIFRICE COMPOSITIONS TO PREVENT HYPERSENSITIVITY AND PROMOTE REMINERALIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOPRA, Suman, K. 6 Trotter Court Monroe NJ 08831 / US | 02 /
PRENCIPE, Michael 39 Spruce Street Princeton Junction NJ 08550 / US | 03 /
ZAIDEL, Lynette 510 Cranford Avenue Cranford NJ 07016 / US | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/46] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2012/06] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 10711976.0 | 01.04.2010 | [2016/46] | WO2010US29684 | Priority number, date | US20090165749P | 01.04.2009 Original published format: US 165749 P | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010115039 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2413882 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2413882 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/19, A61K8/25, A61Q11/00 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/20 (EP,US);
A61K8/25 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/06] | A61K8/19 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELT WIRKENDE ZAHNREINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON ÜBEREMPFINDLICHKEIT UND FÖRDERUNG DER REMINERALISIERUNG | [2012/06] | English: | DUAL ACTION DENTIFRICE COMPOSITIONS TO PREVENT HYPERSENSITIVITY AND PROMOTE REMINERALIZATION | [2012/06] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE DENTIFRICE DOUBLE ACTION CAPABLES DE PRÉVENIR L'HYPERSENSIBILITÉ ET DE FAVORISER LA REMINÉRALISATION | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 01.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.08.2017
ADMISSIBLE GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare (UK) IP Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative Morris, Miriam Elizabeth GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2017/38] | 20.09.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.01.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.01.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/31] | 14.03.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.04.2010 | AT | 16.11.2016 | BE | 16.11.2016 | CY | 16.11.2016 | CZ | 16.11.2016 | DK | 16.11.2016 | EE | 16.11.2016 | ES | 16.11.2016 | FI | 16.11.2016 | HR | 16.11.2016 | IT | 16.11.2016 | LT | 16.11.2016 | LV | 16.11.2016 | MC | 16.11.2016 | MK | 16.11.2016 | NL | 16.11.2016 | PL | 16.11.2016 | RO | 16.11.2016 | SE | 16.11.2016 | SI | 16.11.2016 | SK | 16.11.2016 | SM | 16.11.2016 | TR | 16.11.2016 | BG | 16.02.2017 | NO | 16.02.2017 | GR | 17.02.2017 | IS | 16.03.2017 | PT | 16.03.2017 | IE | 01.04.2017 | LU | 01.04.2017 | MT | 01.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2022/26] |
Former [2020/33] | HU | 01.04.2010 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
IS | 16.03.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 01.04.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
MT | 01.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2020/21] | HU | 01.04.2010 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 01.04.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
MT | 01.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 01.04.2010 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 01.04.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
MT | 01.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.04.2010 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 01.04.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
MT | 01.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 01.04.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
MT | 01.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 01.04.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 16.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO2009158564 (NOVAMIN TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-45 * tables 2,3,4 * * paragraph [0073] *; | [X]WO9913852 (UNIV MARYLAND [US], et al) [X] 1,4,11,15 * claim 1 * * page 6, line 3 *; | [X]DE102004050954 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,4,11,15 * claims 1,9 *; | [XI]WO0172262 (SCHOTT GLAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,11,15,44 * claim 1 * * page 84, line 10 - page 94, line 19 * [I] 1-45; | [Y]US6244871 (LITKOWSKI LEONARD J [US], et al) [Y] 1-45 * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 2 * * column 6, line 29 - line 38 * * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 28 *; | [Y]US3863006 (HODOSH MILTON) [Y] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [A] - MEROLLI A ET AL, "Comparison in in-vivo response between a bioactive glass and a non-bioactive glass", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE: MATERIALS IN MEDICINE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20000401), vol. 11, no. 4, doi:10.1023/A:1008912125171, ISSN 1573-4838, pages 219 - 222, XP019211943 [A] 1-45 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008912125171 | [A] - ANTONIO TILOCCA ET AL, "The Structure of Bioactive Silicate Glasses: New Insight from Molecular Dynamics Simulations", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, (20070101), vol. 19, no. 1, doi:10.1021/cm061631g, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 95 - 103, XP055021888 [A] 1-45 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm061631g | Examination | - NAWARAT WARA-ASWAPATI ET AL, "The effect of a new toothpaste containing potassium nitrate and triclosan on gingival health, plaque formation and dentine hypersensitivity", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PERIODONTOLOGY, (20050101), vol. 32, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1600-051X.2004.00631.x, ISSN 0303-6979, pages 53 - 58, XP055177543 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-051X.2004.00631.x | by applicant | WO9913852 | DE102004050954 | WO0172262 | US6244871 | US3863006 | Opposition | WO2010115039 | WO2008074625 | WO2007051543 | DE102005052400 | WO0172262 | WO2007144662 | WO0215809 | WO0238119 | US3863006 | US4631185 | US6244871 | DE102004050954 | WO9727148 | WO9610985 | - "Tooth Sensitivity Treatment Toothpaste", GNPD, Mintel, (20061000), Database accession no. 601274, XP055411332 | - "Nanosensitive hca", GNPD, Mintel, (20070300), Database accession no. 677422, XP055411341 | - "Toothpaste", GNPD, Mintel, (20090400), Database accession no. 1079067, XP055411344 | - J. FECHNER, "Bioactive glasses as a potential new class of anti-oxidative ingredients for personal care products", SOFW Journal, (20050400), vol. 131, pages 2 - 5, XP055411355 | - "Pluracare L 1220 - Beauty Care Ingredients", Technical Information, (20080300), XP055411370 |