EP2406045 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING PANELS AND PANELS OBTAINED HEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flooring Industries Limited, SARL 10b, Rue des Mérovingiens (ZI Bourmicht) 8070 Bertrange / LU | [2012/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEERSSEMAN, Laurent Beeklaan 33 B-8500 Kortrijk / BE | 02 /
VANHASTEL, Luc Felix d'Hoopstraat 88 B-8700 Tielt / BE | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Schacht, Benny Marcel Corneel, et al Mohawk International Services, BVBA Patent department Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Schacht, Benny Marcel Corneel Unilin Industries, BVBA Patent Department Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | Application number, filing date | 10712513.0 | 26.02.2010 | WO2010IB50849 | Priority number, date | BE20090000146 | 12.03.2009 Original published format: BE 200900146 | [2012/03] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010103417 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2406045 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B27N3/08, B27N3/18, B27N7/00 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
B27N3/08 (EP,US);
B27N3/18 (EP,US);
B27N7/005 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PLATTEN UND AUF DIESE WEISE HERGESTELLTE PLATTEN | [2012/03] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING PANELS AND PANELS OBTAINED HEREBY | [2012/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PANNEAUX ET PANNEAUX OBTENUS PAR CE PROCÉDÉ | [2012/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 07.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/23] | 18.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004036197 (JANIGA EUGENE R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-15,17,18 * paragraphs [0004] , [0010] , [0012] , [0015] , [0019] - [0023] - [0026] , [0029]; figure . *; | [X]DE202004014293U (GLUNZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-6,8,11,14,15,17,18 * paragraphs [0002] , [0012] , [0015] *; | [X]WO2005054600 (HAMBERGER INDUSTRIEWERKE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,11-18 * page 2, line 30 - page 4, line 34 *; | [X]DE102005030788 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 8,11,14,15,17 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] *; | [A]EP1872959 (FRATI DANTE [IT])[A] 1-18 | Examination | EP1454763 | DE10360187 | by applicant | US1971067 | US3173804 | US3554827 | US3811915 | JPH06155729 | DE19532819 | WO9747834 | WO9936623 | WO0148333 | WO0147724 | WO0196689 | WO03053642 | US2004026017 | WO2004042168 | EP1454763 | WO2005044529 | WO2005054600 | EP1624975 | WO2006066776 | WO2006074824 | EP1872959 |