EP2404234 - DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING CIRCUITRY WITH REDUNDANCY AND BIDIRECTIONAL DATA PATHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA 95134-1941 / US | [2012/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANGHAMMER, Martin 2 Birch Grove Southway Alderbury Wiltshire SP53AB / GB | 02 /
LIN, Yi-Wen 378 1/2 W. California Avenue Glendale California 91203 / US | 03 /
STREICHER, Keone 523 Levant Court San Ramon California 94583 / US | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/02] | Appelt, Christian W. Forrester & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10712597.3 | 03.03.2010 | WO2010US26023 | Priority number, date | US20090380841 | 03.03.2009 Original published format: US 380841 | [2012/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010101985 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2404234 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2404234 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/53 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
H03K5/1252 (EP,US);
H03K19/17732 (EP,US);
G06F2207/382 (EP,US);
G06F7/5324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIGITALE SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSSCHALTKREISE MIT REDUNDANZ UND BIDIREKTIONALEN DATENPFADEN | [2012/02] | English: | DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING CIRCUITRY WITH REDUNDANCY AND BIDIRECTIONAL DATA PATHS | [2012/02] | French: | CIRCUIT DE TRAITEMENT NUMÉRIQUE DES SIGNAUX COMPORTANT DES CHEMINS DE DONNÉES DE REDONDANCE ET BIDIRECTIONNELS | [2012/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 19.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13165712.4 / EP2624125 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2010 | AT | 01.05.2013 | BE | 01.05.2013 | CY | 01.05.2013 | CZ | 01.05.2013 | DK | 01.05.2013 | EE | 01.05.2013 | FI | 01.05.2013 | HR | 01.05.2013 | IT | 01.05.2013 | LT | 01.05.2013 | LV | 01.05.2013 | MC | 01.05.2013 | MK | 01.05.2013 | MT | 01.05.2013 | PL | 01.05.2013 | RO | 01.05.2013 | SE | 01.05.2013 | SI | 01.05.2013 | SK | 01.05.2013 | SM | 01.05.2013 | TR | 01.05.2013 | BG | 01.08.2013 | NO | 01.08.2013 | GR | 02.08.2013 | ES | 12.08.2013 | IS | 01.09.2013 | PT | 02.09.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 03.03.2010 | |
AT | 01.05.2013 | ||
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
TR | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 03.03.2010 | |
AT | 01.05.2013 | ||
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 01.05.2013 | |
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4736333 (MEAD CARVER A [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0833244 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1 * abstract ** column 2, line 24 - line 50; figure 2 *; | [A]US7119576 (LANGHAMMER MARTIN [GB], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - column 5, line 60 * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP1830252 (ALTERA CORP [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * figures 2,5 *; | [A]EP1936809 (ALTERA CORP [US]) [A] 1-18 * column 2, paragraph 6 - paragraph 8 * * paragraph 21 - column 6, paragraph 34 * * figures 3-5 * |