EP2387424 - METHOD AND MEMBRANE FOR TISSUE REGENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geistlich Pharma AG Bahnhofstrasse 40 6110 Wolhusen / CH | [2011/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEISTLICH, Peter Kehrsitenstrasse 19 CH-6362 Stansstad / CH | 02 /
SCHLOESSER, Lothar Von-der-Au-Strasse 27 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square GB-London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10712767.2 | 18.01.2010 | WO2010IB00200 | Priority number, date | US20090145334P | 16.01.2009 Original published format: US 145334 P | [2011/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010082138 | Date: | 22.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2387424 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/04, A61L31/14, A61L27/24, A61L27/54, A61L27/56 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
A61L31/044 (EP,US);
A61L31/146 (EP,US);
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MEMBRAN ZUR GEWEBEREGENERATION | [2011/47] | English: | METHOD AND MEMBRANE FOR TISSUE REGENERATION | [2011/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET MEMBRANE POUR RÉGÉNÉRATION DE TISSUS | [2011/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 22.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/51] | 11.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2008107710 (GEISTLICH PETER [CH], et al) [X] 20-23,27-33 * paragraphs [0002] , [0015] , [0043] , [0051] , [0055] , [0058] , [0074] * * claims 1-8 * [I] 24-26,34-41; | [X]EP1252903 (GEISTLICH SOEHNE AG [CH]) [X] 20,21,24,25,27-33 * paragraphs [0015] - [0018] * * claims 1-4,6. 11,12 *; | [A] - JIN QIMING ET AL, "Nanofibrous Scaffolds Incorporating PDGF-BB Microspheres Induce Chemokine Expression and Tissue Neogenesis In Vivo", PLOS ONE, (20080305), vol. 3, no. 3, doi:DOI:10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0001729, ISSN 1932-6203, pages 1 - 9, XP002609816 [A] 20-41 * abstract * * page 5, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 7, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0001729 | Examination | US2007031388 | US5837278 | by applicant | US6713085 | US5837278 |