EP2408422 - PERSONAL-CARE COMPOSITION COMPRISING A HYDROCARBON WAX AND A POLAR OIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREYFOGLE, Laurie, Ellen 1482 Greystone Lane Milford Ohio 45150 / US | 02 /
TANNER, Paul, Robert 3325 Golden Fox Trail Lebanon Ohio 45036 / US | 03 /
ZUKOWSKI, Joseph, Michael 8763 Tanagerwoods Drive Cincinnati Ohio 45249 / US | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Engisch, Gautier, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Engisch, Gautier, et al Procter & Gamble Services Company n.v Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-bever, Brussels / BE | ||
Former [2012/04] | Wilding, Richard Alan Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Ltd Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 10712831.6 | 19.03.2010 | WO2010US27961 | Priority number, date | US20090161783P | 20.03.2009 Original published format: US 161783 P | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010108088 | Date: | 23.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2408422 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/89 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/064 (EP,US);
A61K8/31 (US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/8111 (EP,US);
A61K8/895 (EP,US);
A61K8/92 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/18 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Title | German: | KÖRPERPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM KOHLENWASSERSTOFFWACHS UND EINEM POLAREN ÖL | [2012/04] | English: | PERSONAL-CARE COMPOSITION COMPRISING A HYDROCARBON WAX AND A POLAR OIL | [2012/04] | French: | COMPOSITION DE SOIN PERSONNEL COMPRENANT UNE CIRE HYDROCARBURE ET UNE HUILE POLAIRE | [2012/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 17.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/38] | 12.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005191329 (TANIGUCHI TOSHIYA [JP]) [X] 1-10,12-21,23 * examples 1-4,6 * * paragraph [0002] *; | [X]WO2007086022 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12-21,23 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 18; example 6 * * page 10, line 13 - line 15 *; | [XI]US5250289 (BOOTHROYD STEPHEN [GB], et al) [X] 1-10,12-21 * examples 1,2,3,4,11 * * column 1, line 23 - line 29 * [I] 11,22,23; | [X]US2007196400 (RASCHKE THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-10,12-21 * examples 1,2-6 * * claim 19 *; | [I]EP1466586 (NISSHIN OILLIO GROUP LTD [JP]) [I] 1-23 * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] * * example 9 *; | [A]JPS53148545 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1979, no. 06, Database accession no. 1979-10882B, XP002660947 & JPS53148545 A 19781225 (KANEBO LTD) [A] 1-23 * abstract * | by applicant | US3755560 | US4421769 | US2006275237 | US2004175347 | US2006263309 | - C. D. VAUGHAN, "The Solubility Parameter: What is it?", COSMETICS & TOILETRIES, (199111), vol. 106, pages 69 - 72 | - International Cosmetic Ingredient Dictionary and Handbook, COSMETIC, TOILETRY, AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION | - McCutcheon's Detergents and Emulsifiers, AMERICAN EDITION AND INTERNATIONAL, (1993), pages 235 - 246 |