EP2414366 - SPIRO DERIVATIVES FOR THE MODULATION OF STEAROYL-COA DESATURASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For all designated states Xenon Pharmaceuticals Inc. 3650 Gilmore Way Burnaby, BC V5G 4W8 / CA | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALES, Natalie Novartis Institutes for BioMedical Research Inc. 400 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 02 /
FONAREV, Julia 61-3900 Moresby Drive Richmond British Columbia V7C 4G6 / CA | 03 /
FU, Jianmin 3170 Quintette Crescent Coquitlam British Columbia V3E 3B6 / CA | 04 /
ZHANG, Zaihui 4038 MacDonald Street Vancouver British Columbia V6L 2N9 / CA | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/06] | Woodcock-Bourne, Heather Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 10712932.2 | 30.03.2010 | WO2010EP54234 | Priority number, date | US20090165553P | 01.04.2009 Original published format: US 165553 P | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010112520 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2414366 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/10, A61K31/438, A61P3/00 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
C07D491/10 (EP,US);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/08 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Title | German: | SPIRO-DERIVATE ZUR MODULATION VON STEAROYL-COA-DESATURASE | [2012/06] | English: | SPIRO DERIVATIVES FOR THE MODULATION OF STEAROYL-COA DESATURASE | [2012/06] | French: | DÉRIVÉS SPIRO POUR LA MODULATION DE LA STÉAROYL-COA DÉSATURASE | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 16.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/37] | 28.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2009037542 (GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS SA [CH], et al) [Y] 1-33 * pages 1-4; claim 2 *; | [Y]WO2007027532 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-33 * page 1, lines 31-37; compound 33 * | [Y] - ZHAO ET AL, "Discovery of 1-(4-phenoxypiperidin-1-yl)-2-arylaminoethanone stearoyl-CoA desaturase 1 inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.BMCL.2007.03.099, (20070615), vol. 17, no. 12, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 3388 - 3391, XP022097789 [Y] 1-33 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2007.03.099 | by applicant | WO0162954 | WO0228844 | WO0058360 | WO0123420 | - JEFFCOAT, R. ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1979), vol. 101, no. 2, pages 439 - 445 | - DE ANTUENO, R. ET AL., LIPIDS, (1993), vol. 28, no. 4, pages 285 - 290 | - BUNDGARD, H., Design of Prodrugs, ELSEVIER, (1985), pages 7 - 9,21-24 | - HIGUCHI, T. ET AL., Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems, A.C.S. SYMPOSIUM SERIES, vol. 14 | - GHIBAUDI, L. ET AL., OBES, RES., (2002), vol. 10, pages 956 - 963 | - GRUNDY. S., CARDIOL. REV, (2006), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 322 - 327 | - ZHENG Y. ET AL., "SCD1 is expressed in sebaceous glands and is disrupted in the asebia mouse", NAT GENET., (1999), vol. 23, pages 268 - 270 | - MIYAZAKI, M., "Targeted Disruption of Stearoyl-CoA Desaturase1 Gene in Mice Causes Atrophy of Sebaceous and Meibomian Glands and Depletion of Wax Esters in the Eyelid", J. NUTR., (2001), vol. 131, pages 2260 - 68 | - BINCZEK, E. ET AL., "Obesity resistance of the stearoyl-CoA desaturase-deficient mouse results from disruption of the epidermal lipid barrier and adaptive thermoregulation", BIOL. CHEM, (2007), vol. 388, no. 4, pages 405 - 18 | - SHANKLIN J.; SUMMERVILLE C., PROC. NATL ACAD, SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 2510 - 2514 | - CLARK, S.B. ET AL., "Pharmacotogical modulation of sebaceous gland activity: mechanisms and clinical applications", DERMATOL. CLIN., (2007), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 137 - 46 | - GEIGER, J,M., "Retinoids and sebaceous gland activity", DERMATOLOGY, (1995), vol. 191, no. 4, pages 305 - 10 | - REMINGTON'S PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, MACK PUB. CO. | - PATEL MONA, EXPERT OPIN INVESTIG DRUGS, (200304), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 623 - 33 | - SHANKLIN J.; SUMMERVILLE C., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI, USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 2510 - 2514 |