EP2411677 - COMPRESSOR WITH A BYPASS PORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/05] | COMPRESSOR | ||
[2019/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC, MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls Technology Company 5757 North Green Bay Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53209 / US | [2019/37] |
Former [2017/34] | For all designated states Johnson Controls Technology Company 5757 North Green Bay Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53209 / US | ||
Former [2012/05] | For all designated states Johnson Controls Technology Company 915 East 32nd Street Holland, MI 49423 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEMIT, JR., Paul 33 Cleveland Avenue Waynesboro Pennsylvania 17268 / US | 02 /
COMSTOCK, Angela Marie 6671 Poage Valley Road Ext Roanoke Virginia 24018 / US | 03 /
KOPKO, William L. 228 Creekwood Drive Jacobus Pennsylvania 17407 / US | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [2019/37] |
Former [2012/05] | Wolff, Felix, et al Kutzenberger & Wolff Anwaltssozietät Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 10713066.8 | 26.03.2010 | [2019/37] | WO2010US28966 | Priority number, date | US20090163647P | 26.03.2009 Original published format: US 163647 P | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010111685 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2411677 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2411677 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F04C28/16, F04C28/18, F04C28/12, F04C28/06, F04C28/26, F04C18/16 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
F04C28/26 (EP,KR,US);
F04C18/16 (EP,KR,US);
F04C28/06 (EP,KR,US);
F04C28/12 (EP,KR,US);
F04C28/125 (US);
F04C28/16 (US);
F04C28/18 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/05] | F04C18/16, F04C28/12, F04C28/26, F04C28/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERDICHTER | [2012/05] | English: | COMPRESSOR WITH A BYPASS PORT | [2019/13] | French: | COMPRESSEUR | [2012/05] |
Former [2012/05] | COMPRESSOR | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 24.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16204340.0 / EP3165770 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2010 | AT | 11.09.2019 | CY | 11.09.2019 | CZ | 11.09.2019 | DK | 11.09.2019 | EE | 11.09.2019 | ES | 11.09.2019 | FI | 11.09.2019 | HR | 11.09.2019 | IT | 11.09.2019 | LT | 11.09.2019 | LV | 11.09.2019 | MC | 11.09.2019 | MK | 11.09.2019 | MT | 11.09.2019 | NL | 11.09.2019 | PL | 11.09.2019 | RO | 11.09.2019 | SE | 11.09.2019 | SI | 11.09.2019 | SK | 11.09.2019 | SM | 11.09.2019 | TR | 11.09.2019 | BG | 11.12.2019 | NO | 11.12.2019 | GR | 12.12.2019 | IS | 12.01.2020 | PT | 13.01.2020 | IE | 26.03.2020 | LU | 26.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.03.2010 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CY | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
TR | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IE | 26.03.2020 | ||
LU | 26.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
TR | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IE | 26.03.2020 | ||
LU | 26.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IE | 26.03.2020 | ||
LU | 26.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IE | 26.03.2020 | ||
LU | 26.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AT | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
LU | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | EE | 11.09.2019 | |
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | ES | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 11.09.2019 | |
NO | 11.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB384355 (FREDERICK CHARLES GREENFIELD) [X] 1-4,11,12,19 * the whole document * [I] 5-10,13-18,20; | [A]US4222712 (HUBER MELVIN F, et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2083868 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [XI]EP0350426 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,11,12,19 * the whole document * [I] 6-10,13-18,20; | [A]EP1128067 (ATLAS COPCO AIRPOWER NV [BE]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]US6422846 (ZHONG JIANPING [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004109782 (TANG YAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | Examination | US6135744 | JPS57129994U |