EP2417799 - ROUTE OPTIMIZATION FOR DIRECTLY CONNECTED PEERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2012/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSIRTSIS, Georgios 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
VANDERVEEN, Michaela 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
PARK, Vincent, D. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10713092.4 | 06.04.2010 | WO2010US30057 | Priority number, date | US20090420599 | 08.04.2009 Original published format: US 420599 | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010117994 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2417799 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/02, // H04W36/14, H04W80/04, H04W8/08 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
H04W76/14 (EP,US);
H04W8/08 (KR);
H04W80/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/142 (EP,KR,US);
H04W8/082 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/07] | H04W36/14, H04W80/04, H04W8/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Title | German: | LEITWEGOPTIMIERUNG FÜR DIREKT VERBUNDENE PEERS | [2014/44] | English: | ROUTE OPTIMIZATION FOR DIRECTLY CONNECTED PEERS | [2012/07] | French: | OPTIMISATION DU ROUTAGE POUR PAIRS EN CONNEXION DIRECTE | [2014/45] |
Former [2012/07] | ROUTENOPTIMIERUNG FÜR DIREKT VERBUNDENE PEERS | ||
Former [2012/07] | OPTIMISATION DE TRAJET POUR DES HOMOLOGUES CONNECTÉS DIRECTEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 22.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 13.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.08.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002085520 (SYDON UWE [DE], et al); | [XY]WO2005084045 (VODAFONE HOLDING GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]US2007230410 (THUBERT PASCAL [FR], et al); | [X]US2008002658 (SOLIMAN SAMIR S [US]); | [Y]WO2008145174 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) |