EP2421699 - THERMOPLASTIC FILM, METHODS FOR MAKING SUCH FILM, AND THE USE OF SUCH FILM AS BATTERY SEPARATOR FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Battery Separator Film Co., Ltd. 1190-13, Iguchi Nasushiobara-shi Tochigi / JP | [2012/46] |
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states Toray Battery Separator Film Godo Kaisha 1190-13, Iguchi Nasushiobara-shi Tochigi 329-2763 / JP | ||
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Toray Tonen Specialty Separator Godo Kaisha 1190-13, Iguchi Nasushiobara-shi Tochigi 329-2763 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANT, Patrick 1038 Shorewood Drive Seabrook TX 77586 / US | 02 /
THURMAN, Derek 14010 Ivy Bluff Court Houston TX 77062 / US | 03 /
KONO, Koichi c/o Nasu Plant Toray Tonen Specialty Separator Godo Kaisha 1190-13 Iguchi Nasushiobara-shi Tochigi-ken 329-2763 / JP | 04 /
TAKITA, Kotaro c/o Nasu Plant Toray Tonen Specialty Separator Godo Kaisha 1190-13 Iguchi Nasushiobara-shi Tochigi-ken 329-2763 / JP | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Webster, Jeremy Mark Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Webster, Jeremy Mark Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10713764.8 | 07.04.2010 | WO2010US30238 | Priority number, date | US20090172075P | 23.04.2009 Original published format: US 172075 P | US20090218728P | 19.06.2009 Original published format: US 218728 P | US20090172071P | 23.04.2009 Original published format: US 172071 P | EP20090162565 | 12.06.2009 Original published format: EP 09162565 | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010123685 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2421699 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/22, B32B5/24, B32B5/26, H01M2/16, B32B27/12 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/24 (KR);
B32B27/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/18 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/022 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/18 (KR);
H01M50/411 (KR);
H01M50/417 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/44 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/449 (KR);
H01M50/454 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/489 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/491 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/0253 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/30 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/50 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/54 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/724 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2457/10 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE FOLIE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DERARTIGEN FOLIE SOWIE VERWENDUNG DIESER FOLIE AKS BATTERIETRENNFOLIE | [2012/09] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC FILM, METHODS FOR MAKING SUCH FILM, AND THE USE OF SUCH FILM AS BATTERY SEPARATOR FILM | [2012/09] | French: | FILM THERMOPLASTIQUE, PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL FILM, ET UTILISATION D'UN TEL FILM COMME FILM SÉPARATEUR POUR BATTERIE | [2012/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 08.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/15] | 03.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0352617 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-3,12,15,16,20,21,25 * page 3, lines 24-31 - page 5, line 47; example 1; claims 1 3 5-7 8; table IV * * page 6, lines 14-16; example 2 *; | [A]US5084534 (WELBORN JR HOWARD C [US], et al) [A] 2-9* the whole document *; | [XAI]EP0811479 (TONEN SEKIYUKAGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1 * page 3, lines 37-57 - page 5, lines 30-40, 51-53; examples 1-4; claim 1 2 8 11 * * page 4, lines 1-8 * [A] 14,18,25 [I] 8,9 | by applicant | US3849241 | US4526733 | EP0352617 | US5160746 | EP0811479 | EP0916256 | US6692868 | - C. J. ELLISON ET AL., POLYMER, (2007), vol. 48, pages 3306 - 3316 |