EP2413935 - LOW DOSE PIPAMPERONE IN TREATING MOOD DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.05.2022 [2022/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anima BV Alkerstraat 28 3570 Alken / BE | [2022/15] |
Former [2012/06] | For all designated states PharmaNeuroBoost N.V. Alkerstraat 30A 3570 Alken / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUNTINX, Erik Alkerstraat 28 B-3570 Alken / BE | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2012/06] | De Clercq, Ann G. Y., et al De Clercq & Partners cvba Edgard Gevaertdreef 10 a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | Application number, filing date | 10713885.1 | 30.03.2010 | WO2010EP54249 | Priority number, date | EP20090156750 | 30.03.2009 Original published format: EP 09156750 | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010112529 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2413935 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4545, A61P25/24 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
A61K31/4545 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | 18.10.2011 | BA | 18.10.2011 | ME | 18.10.2011 | RS | 18.10.2011 | Title | German: | NIEDER DOSIERTES PIPAMPERON BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON STIMMUNGSSTÖRUNGEN | [2012/06] | English: | LOW DOSE PIPAMPERONE IN TREATING MOOD DISORDERS | [2012/06] | French: | PIPAMPÉRONE À FAIBLE DOSE POUR TRAITER DES TROUBLES DE L'HUMEUR | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 17.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2013 | 01.09.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 18.03.2013 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2014/16] | 01.09.2021 | Resumption of proceedings | [2021/09] | 18.03.2013 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2021/09] | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2005053796 (B & B BEHEER NV [BE], et al) [AD] 1-12 * pages 6, 7, 10; figure -; example - * * pages 14, 203; claims 42-44 *; | [X]EP1547650 (B & B BEHEER NV [BE]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0010] - [0011] - [0 29] , [0 31] - [0033] - [0 36] *; | [I] - CHALAMET M J, "CHARACTER DISORDERS IN THE ELDERLY", PSYCHOLOGIE MEDICALE, SERVICE DE PRESSE EDITION INFORMATION, PARIS, FR, (19810101), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 0048-5756, pages 365 - 369, XP009078511 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - ANSOMS C ET AL, "SLEEP DISORDERS IN PATIENTS WITH SEVERE MENTAL DEPRESSION: DOUBLE-BLIND PLACEBO-CONTROLLED EVALUATION OF THE VALUE OF PIPAMPERONE (DIPIPERON)", ACTA PSYCHIATRICA SCANDINAVICA, MUNKSGAARD, COPENHAGEN, DE, (19770201), vol. 55, no. 2, ISSN 0001-690X, pages 116 - 122, XP009041169 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2005053796 | - GROSS, J. J.; MUNOZ, R. F., CLINICAL PSYCHOLOGY: SCIENCE AND PRACTICE, (1995), vol. 2, pages 151 - 164 | - MENNIN, D.S.; HEIMBERG, R. G.; TURK, C. L.; FRESCO, D. M., CLINICAL PSYCHOLOGY: SCIENCE AND PRACTICE, (2002), vol. 9, pages 85 - 90 | - JOURNAL OF PSYCHOPATHOLOGY AND BEHAVIORAL ASSESSMENT, (200403), vol. 26, no. 1 | - S. M. STAHL, Essential Psychopharmacology, Depression and Bipolar Disorders, UNIVERSITY PRESS, (20000615), vol. 151 | - HAMILTON M., J NEUROL NEUROSURG PSYCHIATRY, vol. 196023, pages 56 - 62 | - Pharmaceutics and Pharmacy Practice, J.B. LIPPINCOTT COMPANY, (1982), pages 238 - 250 | - ASHP Handbook on Injectable Drugs, (1986), pages 622 - 630 | - KHAN ET AL., "Symptom Reduction and Suicide Risk in Patients Treated With Placebo in Antidepressant Clinical Trials", ARCH. OF GENERAL PSYCHIATRY, (200004), vol. 57 | - GOLDSTEIN ET AL., CLIN. PSYCHIATRY | - THASE ET AL., BR. J. PSYCHIATRY, (2001), vol. 178, pages 234 - 241 |