EP2414691 - ROLLING BEARING WITH SEGMENTED CAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/06] | ROLLER BEARING COMPRISING A SEGMENTED CAGE | ||
[2016/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beuerlein, Werner Weichselhecken 10 97332 Volkach / DE | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton Pöhner Scharfenberger & Partner Kaiserstrasse 33 Postfach 6323 97013 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/22] | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton Patentanwalt Dr. W. Pöhner Kaiserstrasse 33 Postfach 6323 97013 Würzburg / DE | ||
Former [2012/06] | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton Patentanwalt, Röntgenring 4 97070 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10714162.4 | 03.03.2010 | [2016/22] | WO2010DE00243 | Priority number, date | DE20091012241 | 07.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009012241 | [2012/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010102603 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2414691 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2414691 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/24 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
F16C33/502 (EP,US);
F16C19/24 (EP,US);
F16C2300/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄLZLAGER MIT SEGMENTIERTEM KÄFIG | [2012/06] | English: | ROLLING BEARING WITH SEGMENTED CAGE | [2016/03] | French: | ROULEMENT AVEC CAGE SEGMENTÉE | [2016/03] |
Former [2012/06] | ROLLER BEARING COMPRISING A SEGMENTED CAGE | ||
Former [2012/06] | PALIER À ROULEMENT À CAGE À SEGMENTS | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 29.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2010 | BG | 01.06.2016 | CY | 01.06.2016 | CZ | 01.06.2016 | EE | 01.06.2016 | ES | 01.06.2016 | FI | 01.06.2016 | HR | 01.06.2016 | LT | 01.06.2016 | LV | 01.06.2016 | MC | 01.06.2016 | MK | 01.06.2016 | MT | 01.06.2016 | PL | 01.06.2016 | SE | 01.06.2016 | SI | 01.06.2016 | SM | 01.06.2016 | TR | 01.06.2016 | NO | 01.09.2016 | GR | 02.09.2016 | IS | 01.10.2016 | PT | 03.10.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 03.03.2010 | |
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 03.03.2010 | |
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 03.03.2010 | |
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.03.2010 | |
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 01.06.2016 | |
NO | 01.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XD]DE874683 (VER KUGELLAGERFABRIKEN AG) [XD] 1,2,7,14 * the whole document *; | [X]US2946633 (ANDREAS GOTHBERG KARL EVALD) [X] 1,3-5 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1296976 (THE TORRINGTON COMPANY LTD.) [X] 1,3-5,7,15,16 * the whole document *; | [XA]CH612479 (SCHNEEBERGER AG W [CH]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,12,13 * page 3, column R, line 4 - line 68; figures 1-17 * * page 2, column R, line 23 - line 52 * [A] 9,10; | [XA]DE7935205U (SKF KUGELLAGERFABRIKEN GMBH) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [A] 4,10; | [X]DE8621532U (GUGEL, GEORG) [X] 1,3-5,14,15 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]JPH08121487 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7,9 * abstract * [A] 11; | [XA]FR2876169 (DEFONTAINE SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9 * the whole document * [A] 10,12,13; | [X]DE102006045436 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,14 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2009056310 (SKF AB [SE], et al) [XP] 1,3-5,7,9,10,16* the whole document *; | [XP]DE102009004657 (SKF AB [SE]) [XP] 1,3-5,7-10,16 * the whole document * | Examination | DE102008034922 | JP2010144794 |