|
01.10.2014 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.10.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.10.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
02.07.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2012 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
07.12.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.08.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2011 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2011 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
14.10.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.2010 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
10.04.2010 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
10.04.2010 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
8 |
|
10.04.2010 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
36 |
|
10.04.2010 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
9 |
|
10.04.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |