22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
18.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
27.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
28.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
21.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] |
03.10.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
06.06.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
23.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] |
16.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
25.10.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
19.10.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.10.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.07.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.06.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
07.06.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
16.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] |
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
10.12.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.07.2011 |
First examination report |
|
26.07.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.07.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
04.03.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
04.03.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
18.02.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.10.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.10.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|