Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9099508 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2015 | B2 | US2012022827 | 26.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP02213 | 09.04.2010 | DE102009016811 | 09.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5544414B | Global Dossier | 09.07.2014 | B2 | JP2012523682 | 04.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP02213 | 09.04.2010 | DE102009016811 | 09.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2304769 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2013 | B1 | EP2304769 | 06.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP02213 | 09.04.2010 | DE102009016811 | 09.04.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010115632 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2011 | A8 | WO2010115632 | 14.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009016811 | 09.04.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102009016811 | 14.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009016811 | 09.04.2009 |