EP2416673 - INTRODUCING OBJECTS INTO ELONGATE SMOKING ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Investments) Ltd Globe House 1 Water Street London, WC2R 3LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Investments) Ltd Globe House 1 Water Street London, WC2R 3LA / GB | ||
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Investments) Ltd Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAENEN, Rene c/o British American Tobacco Belgium De Koninckstraat 38 1080 Brussels / BE | 02 /
KALJURA, Karl c/o British American Tobacco (Investments) Ltd Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2013/08] |
Former [2012/07] | 01 /
NAENEN, Rene c/o British American Tobacco Belgium De Koninckstraat 38 B-1080 Brussels / BE | ||
02 /
KALJURA, Karl c/o British American Tobacco (Investments) Ltd Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2012/07] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10714600.3 | 31.03.2010 | WO2010EP54374 | Priority number, date | GB20090006192 | 09.04.2009 Original published format: GB 0906192 | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010115829 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2416673 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2416673 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/02 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
A24D3/0216 (EP,US);
A24D3/02 (KR);
A24D3/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINFÜHREN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN IN LÄNGLICHEN TABAKARTIKELN | [2012/40] | English: | INTRODUCING OBJECTS INTO ELONGATE SMOKING ARTICLES | [2012/07] | French: | INTRODUCTION D'OBJETS DANS DES ARTICLES ALONGÉS DU TABAC | [2013/08] |
Former [2012/07] | EINFÜHRUNG VON OBJEKTEN IN LÄNGLICHE RAUCHARTIKEL | ||
Former [2012/07] | INTRODUCTION D'OBJETS DANS DES ARTICLES À FUMER ALLONGÉS | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 19.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.03.2013 | CY | 06.03.2013 | DK | 06.03.2013 | EE | 06.03.2013 | FI | 06.03.2013 | HR | 06.03.2013 | LT | 06.03.2013 | LV | 06.03.2013 | MK | 06.03.2013 | MT | 06.03.2013 | NL | 06.03.2013 | RO | 06.03.2013 | SE | 06.03.2013 | SI | 06.03.2013 | SK | 06.03.2013 | SM | 06.03.2013 | TR | 06.03.2013 | IE | 31.03.2013 | LU | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | BG | 06.06.2013 | NO | 06.06.2013 | GR | 07.06.2013 | ES | 17.06.2013 | IS | 06.07.2013 | PT | 08.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | BE | 06.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MK | 06.03.2013 | ||
MT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
SM | 06.03.2013 | ||
TR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | BE | 06.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
SM | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | BE | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
SM | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | BE | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | BE | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | BE | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | BE | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | BE | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
NO | 06.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3884741 (SEXSTONE JOHN H) [X] 1-6,11,12,27-29 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 22 * * column 4, line 8 - column 5, line 39 * * column 6, lines 15-37 *; | [A]US2008302373 (STOKES CYNTHIA STEWART [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * abstract *; | [XA]US2006135335 (DAWSON JOHN [US], et al) [X] 30,32,33,35 * paragraphs [0003] , [0008] , [0024] - [0027]; figures 1,2,5 * [A] 31,34,36; | [X]GB2173388 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC) [X] 30,35 * abstract *; | [X]GB1601221 (LIGGETT GROUP INC) [X] 30,35 * page 2, lines 40-82; figure - *; | [X]US2007119467 (AKHMETSHIN MARSIL R [RU], et al) [X] 37-41 * paragraphs [0086] - [0092]; figure 9 *; | [A]WO2006082529 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [A] 37-41 * abstract *; | [A]WO2006059134 (FILTRONA INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 37-41 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2007038053 |