EP2418997 - BOX-TYPE WAREWASHER INCLUDING HEAT RECOVERY SYSTEM FOR REDUCING AIR MOISTURE LEVEL AT THE END OF CYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Premark FEG L.L.C. 1300 North Market Street, Suite 504 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUNSWICK, Brian, A. 5799 Bradley Drive Tipp City OH 45371 / US | 02 /
D'FANTIS, Michael, S. 921 Elmwood Drive Macedonia OH 44056 / US | 03 /
FISCHER, David, L. 970 Fred Jonston Drive Fairborn OH 45324 / US | 04 /
FORTMAN, Joshua, A. 220 W. Jackson Avenue Unit 104 Knoxville TN 37902 / US | 05 /
GRUESER, Thomas, A. 148 N. Hampton Road Donnelsville OH 45319 / US | 06 /
KERLIN, Todd, M. 2625 Lowell Avenue Lima OH 45805 / US | 07 /
MENCSIK LUCAS, Catherine, A. 6871 Cedar Valley Court Dayton OH 45414 / US | 08 /
RICE, James, D., Jr. 1890 Sally Circle Miamisburg OH 45342 / US | 09 /
ROHREN, Craig, S. 1400 W. Dorothy Lane Dayton OH 45409 / US | 10 /
SHAPPIE, Benjamin, J. 10115 Klipstine Road Versailles OH 45380 / US | 11 /
STROUP, Benjamin, A. 1000 W. Horatio Street Unit 214 Tampa, FL 33606 / US | 12 /
THOMPSON, John, D. 175 Audubon Road Sewickley PA 15143 / US | 13 /
WARNER, Charles, E. 160 Jean Circle Troy OH 45373 / US | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR P.O. Box 102605 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10715027.8 | 12.04.2010 | WO2010US30666 | Priority number, date | US20090169545P | 15.04.2009 Original published format: US 169545 P | US20100684204 | 08.01.2010 Original published format: US 684204 | [2012/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010120657 | Date: | 21.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2418997 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
A47L15/4291 (EP,US);
A47L15/0078 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Title | German: | KASTENARTIGER GESCHIRRSPÜLER MIT EINEM WÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNGSSYSTEM ZUR REDUZIERUNG DES LUFTFEUCHTIGKEITSNIVEAUS AM ENDE DES ZYKLUS | [2012/08] | English: | BOX-TYPE WAREWASHER INCLUDING HEAT RECOVERY SYSTEM FOR REDUCING AIR MOISTURE LEVEL AT THE END OF CYCLE | [2012/08] | French: | LAVE-VAISSELLE DE TYPE BOÎTE COMPRENANT UN SYSTÈME DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE CHALEUR POUR RÉDUIRE LE NIVEAU D'HUMIDITÉ DANS L'AIR À LA FIN D'UN CYCLE | [2012/08] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 08.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 01.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB1486725 (STIERLEN MAQUET AG) [X] 1,2,15 * page 1, line 52 - page 3, line 72; figures 1-4 * [A] 3-14,16-22; | [XI]GB2030446 (WEXIOEDISK AB) [X] 1,2,15 * page 1, line 79 - page 2, line 95; figure 1 * * page 3, line 12 - line 22 * [I] 3-14,16-22; | [A]US4326551 (VOORHEES JOHN E) [A] 1-22* column 5, line 5 - column 8, line 2 *; | [A]US5660193 (ARCHER JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 52; figure 1 *; | [A]US2004187339 (DUDEN ROMAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010]; figure 1 * | Examination | WO2006063895 |