Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8568618 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2013 | B2 | US2012032118 | 09.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009017262 | 11.04.2009 | WO2010EP02147 | 03.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102388487B | Global Dossier | 13.05.2015 | B | CN102388487 | 21.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009017262 | 11.04.2009 | WO2010EP02147 | 03.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2417655 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2013 | B1 | EP2417655 | 15.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009017262 | 11.04.2009 | WO2010EP02147 | 03.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010115601 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009017262 | 11.04.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102009017262 | 14.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009017262 | 11.04.2009 |