EP2424569 - ANTI-MESOTHELIN IMMUNOCONJUGATES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/10] | ANTI-MESOTHELIN IMMUNOCONJUGATES AND USES THEREFOR | ||
[2017/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [2012/39] |
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAHNERT, Antje Sadowastr. 17 42115 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
BERHÖRSTER, Kerstin Am Vogelherd 15 45239 Essen / DE | 03 /
HEISLER, Iring Friedenshor 45b 42369 Wuppertal / DE | 04 /
KOPITZ, Charlotte Christine Brahestr. 21 10589 Berlin / DE | 05 /
SCHUMACHER, Joachim Lipkenskothen 31 42113 Wuppertal / DE | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [N/P] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 DE-40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2013/01] | BIP Patents Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/39] | Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/10] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10715114.4 | 16.04.2010 | [2017/42] | WO2010EP02342 | Priority number, date | EP20090005909 | 29.04.2009 Original published format: EP 09005909 | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010124797 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2424569 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2424569 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, A61P35/00 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
A61K47/6851 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/00 (CN,KR);
A61K39/001168 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K47/6803 (KR);
A61K47/68033 (EP,CN,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P43/00 (EP,KR);
C07D498/18 (KR);
C07K16/30 (CN,KR,US);
C07K2317/14 (CN,KR,US);
C07K2317/56 (CN,US);
C07K2317/565 (CN,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/10] | A61K47/48, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTI-MESOTHELIN-IMMUNKONJUGATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | [2012/10] | English: | ANTI-MESOTHELIN IMMUNOCONJUGATES AND USES THEREOF | [2017/19] | French: | IMMUNOCONJUGUÉS ANTI-MÉSOTHÉLINE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2012/10] |
Former [2012/10] | ANTI-MESOTHELIN IMMUNOCONJUGATES AND USES THEREFOR | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 19.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 14.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17189537.8 / EP3292874 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39] | Request for further processing for: | 19.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 19.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SM | 18.10.2017 | [2018/40] | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9928471 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al); | [XI]US2005276812 (EBENS ALLEN J JR [US], et al); | [XI]WO2006099141 (MORPHOTEK INC [US], et al); | [XP]WO2009068204 (BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG [DE], et al); | [XP]WO2010008726 (IMMUNOGEN INC [US], et al); |