EP2417152 - PROCESS FOR ISOLATING LINACLOTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/07] | PROCESS FOR ISOLATING THERAPEUTIC PEPTIDE | ||
[2012/41] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corden Pharma Colorado, Inc. 2075 N 55th Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2012/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLEMING, Michael Paul 2692 Beech Circle Longmont Colorado 80051 / US | 02 /
PETERSEN, Raymond Dennis 2230E. 103rd Place Thornton Colorado 80229 / US | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10715185.4 | 07.04.2010 | WO2010EP54577 | Priority number, date | US20090168259P | 10.04.2009 Original published format: US 168259 P | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010115916 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2417152 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2417152 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/08, C07K14/245 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
C07K14/245 (EP,US);
C07K7/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG VON LINACLOTID | [2012/41] | English: | PROCESS FOR ISOLATING LINACLOTIDE | [2012/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR L'ISOLEMENT DE LA LINACLOTIDE | [2012/41] |
Former [2012/07] | VERFAHREN ZUM ISOLIEREN EINES THERAPEUTISCHEN PEPTIDS | ||
Former [2012/07] | PROCESS FOR ISOLATING THERAPEUTIC PEPTIDE | ||
Former [2012/07] | PROCÉDÉ D'ISOLEMENT D'UN PEPTIDE THÉRAPEUTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 01.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gallafent, Alison Alison Gallafent Ltd 21 Bridge St Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gallafent, Alison Alison Gallafent Ltd 4 George Street Llandeilo SA19 6AS / GB | 06.08.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.12.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.04.2010 | AT | 02.10.2013 | BG | 02.10.2013 | CH | 02.10.2013 | CY | 02.10.2013 | CZ | 02.10.2013 | EE | 02.10.2013 | FI | 02.10.2013 | HR | 02.10.2013 | IT | 02.10.2013 | LI | 02.10.2013 | LT | 02.10.2013 | LV | 02.10.2013 | MC | 02.10.2013 | MT | 02.10.2013 | NL | 02.10.2013 | PL | 02.10.2013 | RO | 02.10.2013 | SI | 02.10.2013 | SK | 02.10.2013 | TR | 02.10.2013 | NO | 01.01.2014 | GR | 03.01.2014 | IS | 02.02.2014 | PT | 03.02.2014 | GB | 07.04.2014 | LU | 07.04.2014 | DE | 01.11.2014 | [2022/27] |
Former [2019/38] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CH | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
GB | 07.04.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
CH | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
GB | 07.04.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
CH | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
GB | 07.04.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
CH | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
GB | 07.04.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
GB | 07.04.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CZ | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 02.10.2013 | |
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 02.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2004069165 (MICROBIA INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005087797 (MICROBIA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-26* the whole document * | by applicant | WO2004069165 | US7371727 | - CAMILLERI, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2001), vol. 120, pages 652 - 668 | - TALLEY, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1995), vol. 109, pages 1736 - 1741 | - DROSSMAN, DIG DIS SCI, (1993), vol. 38, pages 1569 - 1580 | - CURRENT OPINION IN MOLECULAR THERAPEUTICS, (2007), vol. 9, no. 4 | - CURRENT OPINION IN MOLECULAR THERAPEUTICS, (2007), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 403 - 410 |