EP2406196 - THIN FILM DEPOSITION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France 18, Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIGNON, Guillaume 27 rue Ballu F-75009 Paris / FR | 02 /
NADAUD, Nicolas 97 rue de la Santé F-75013 Paris / FR | 03 /
TRAN, Binh 9-11 rue des Freres Robin F-78530 Buc / FR | 04 /
KIM, Se-jong 47 bis rue Saint-Lazare F-60200 Compiegne / FR | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Teyssedre, Laurent Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10715315.7 | 10.03.2010 | WO2010FR50409 | Priority number, date | FR20090051525 | 11.03.2009 Original published format: FR 0951525 | [2012/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010103237 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2406196 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/00, C23C14/08, C23C14/58 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
C03C17/002 (EP,US);
C23C14/5806 (EP,US);
C03C2218/156 (EP,US);
C03C2218/32 (EP,US);
C03C2218/345 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Title | German: | DÜNNSCHICHTABLAGERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2012/03] | English: | THIN FILM DEPOSITION METHOD | [2012/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPÔT DE COUCHE MINCE | [2012/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 03.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 02.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]FR2911130 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) [X] 1,2,6-15 * abstract * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 26 * * page 7, line 5 - line 8 * * page 7, line 14 - line 18 * * page 8, line 5 - line 9 * * page 8, line 19 - line 21 * * page 10, line 20 - line 24 * * page 13, line 26 - page 14, line 21 * * page 15, line 4 - line 6 * * examples 7-9; claims 1-21 * [I] 3-5; | [XI]US2008008829 (BLACKER RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-15 * abstract * * figure 2; claims 1,6 * * page 1, paragraph 8 * * page 2, paragraph 18 - page 3, paragraph 19 * [I] 3-5; | [A]FR2892409 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) [A] 3-5 * page 4, line 28 - line 29 * * page 6, line 13 - line 20 * * page 14; example 6 * |