EP2419961 - PEST CONTROL APPARATUS AND SYSTEM HAVING AN ELECTROMAGNETIC ATTRACTING OR REPELLING DEVICE AND HOUSING THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Corporation 100 Campus Drive Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CINK, James H. 1003 Saint Paul Run Ballwin Missouri 63021 / US | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10715399.1 | 13.04.2010 | WO2010US30845 | Priority number, date | US20090169163P | 14.04.2009 Original published format: US 169163 P | [2012/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010120743 | Date: | 21.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2419961 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/42, A01M1/02 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
A01M1/023 (EP,US);
A01M1/02 (KR,US);
A01M1/026 (EP,US);
A01M1/22 (KR);
A01M1/226 (US);
A01M29/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Title | German: | SCHÄDLINGSBEKÄMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM MIT EINER ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN ANZIEH- ODER ABSTOSSEINRICHTUNG UND GEHÄUSE DAFÜR | [2012/08] | English: | PEST CONTROL APPARATUS AND SYSTEM HAVING AN ELECTROMAGNETIC ATTRACTING OR REPELLING DEVICE AND HOUSING THEREFOR | [2012/08] | French: | APPAREIL DE LUTTE ANTIPARASITAIRE ET SYSTÈME AYANT UN DISPOSITIF ATTIRANT OU REPOUSSANT ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE ET BOÎTIER APPARENTÉ | [2012/08] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 02.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 17.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2014 | Request for further processing for: | 02.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 02.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.08.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007137096 (RAGON KEVIN W [US], et al) [Y] 1-26 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0067] *; | [Y]US2003088968 (NODA ATSUHITO [JP]) [Y] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] *; | [Y]US2007091007 (SAKO YOSHIHIRO [JP]) [Y] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0053] *; | [A]US2003128119 (LAKE RICKIE C [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * figures 13-16 * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0069] *; | [A]US2003001745 (BARBER DANIEL T [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0049] *; | [A]DE19815916 (DERIAZ MARCEL [CH]) [A] 1-26 * column 1, paragraph 53 - column 2, paragraph 48 * |