EP2435230 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ELASTOMER FINISHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520 / US | [2016/42] |
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. A Corporation of the State Delaware 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77522-2149 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YEH, Richard, Cheng-Ming 4910 Braebum Drive Bellaire TX 77401-5316 / US | 02 /
WANG, Yu, Feng 15907 Moon Rock Drive Houston TX 77062 / US | 03 /
SWOBODA, J., P. Haineau Claville F-76170 Grandcamp / FR | 04 /
BROUSSARD, Oscar, K., III 744 Woodgate Boulevard Baton Rouge LA 70808 / US | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe LLC IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | Mareschal, Anne, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | ||
Former [2014/44] | Mareschal, Anne, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Shared Services Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | ||
Former [2012/14] | Gerstberger, Gisela, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Shared Services P.O. Box 105 Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 10715440.3 | 19.04.2010 | [2016/42] | WO2010US31592 | Priority number, date | US20090475034 | 29.05.2009 Original published format: US 475034 | [2012/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010138257 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2435230 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2435230 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29B13/06, // B29K9/06 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
B29B13/065 (EP,US);
B29K2009/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/14] | B29B13/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENDBEHANDLUNG VON ELASTOMEREN | [2012/14] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ELASTOMER FINISHING | [2012/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE FINITION D'ÉLASTOMÈRE | [2012/14] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 20.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 09.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2010 | AT | 19.10.2016 | CY | 19.10.2016 | CZ | 19.10.2016 | DK | 19.10.2016 | EE | 19.10.2016 | ES | 19.10.2016 | FI | 19.10.2016 | HR | 19.10.2016 | IT | 19.10.2016 | LT | 19.10.2016 | LV | 19.10.2016 | MC | 19.10.2016 | MK | 19.10.2016 | NL | 19.10.2016 | PL | 19.10.2016 | RO | 19.10.2016 | SE | 19.10.2016 | SI | 19.10.2016 | SK | 19.10.2016 | SM | 19.10.2016 | TR | 19.10.2016 | BG | 19.01.2017 | NO | 19.01.2017 | GR | 20.01.2017 | IS | 19.02.2017 | PT | 20.02.2017 | IE | 19.04.2017 | LU | 19.04.2017 | MT | 19.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.04.2010 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.04.2010 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.04.2010 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 19.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US4185057 (LOETTERLE MARVIN F [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7 * column 1, line 13 - line 17 * * column 2, line 44 - line 66 * * column 4, line 11 - line 32 * * figures 1,5-7 * [Y] 2,3,5,9-15 [I] 6,8; | [Y]US3240746 (DAVIS CHARLES L) [Y] 2,3,5,9-15 * column 1, line 9 - line 13 * * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 20 * * column 3, line 56 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2371722 (WANDERER FREDERICK W) [A] 1-15 * page 2, column 1, line 56 - page 1, column 2, line 11 * * figure 6 *; | [A]DE1579106 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG) [A] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3834440 (MC CRACKEN N) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US3591928 (NARA JIYUICHI) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2224269 (GONARD ANDRE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3240746 | US4185057 | US3035306 | GB1590532 |