EP2421564 - METHODS FOR KILLING OR INHIBITING GROWTH OF MYCOBACTERIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogsho̸jvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FESTERSEN, Rikke Digevaenget 20 DK-Herlev 2730 / DK | 02 /
GJERMANSEN, Morten Olsbaekdal 31 DK-2670 Greve / DK | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/09] | Application number, filing date | 10715536.8 | 22.04.2010 | WO2010EP55339 | Priority number, date | EP20090158526 | 22.04.2009 Original published format: EP 09158526 | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010122100 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2421564 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/18, A01N63/00 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
A61L2/18 (EP,US);
A01N59/00 (EP,US);
A01N63/50 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/00, A01N2300/00 (US);
A01N59/00, A01N59/00, A01N59/08, A01N63/30 (US);
A01N59/00, A01N59/00, A01N59/08, A01N63/50 (US,EP);
A01N63/50, A01N63/30 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABTÖTUNG ODER UNTERDRÜCKUNG DES WACHSTUMS VON MYKOBAKTERIEN | [2012/09] | English: | METHODS FOR KILLING OR INHIBITING GROWTH OF MYCOBACTERIA | [2012/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR TUER OU INHIBER LA CROISSANCE DE MYCOBACTÉRIES | [2012/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 18.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 01.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5227161 (KESSLER JACK H [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 19 - line 22 * * column 3, line 19 - line 37 * * examples 1,2 *; | [Y]WO9908531 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, line 4 - line 23 * * page 8, line 36 - page 9, line 38 *; | [Y]WO0027438 (UNIV MONTREAL [CA], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 6, line 32 - page 7, line 7 * * page 16, line 3 - page 17, line 19 *; | [Y]WO0208377 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK]) [Y] 1-15 * page 18, line 26 - page 21, line 13 *; | [Y] - HANSEN E H ET AL, "Curvularia haloperoxidase: Antimicrobial activity and potential application as a surface disinfectant", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, NEW YORK, USA, (20030801), vol. 69, no. 8, pages 4611 - 4617, XP002512029 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.69.8.4611-4617.2003 | by applicant | WO9527046 | WO9529996 | WO9704102 | WO9931990 | WO0050606 | US6248575 | WO0179459 | WO0179458 | WO0179461 | WO0179460 |