EP2406121 - TIE ROD FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/03] | ASSEMBLY, METHOD FOR APPLYING SAID ASSEMBLY, AND TOOL FOR APPLYING THE METHOD | ||
[2014/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUMP, Stefan Kastanienweg 20 49453 Rehden / DE | 02 /
ROSENGARTEN, Andreas Visbecker Ring 3 49186 Bad Iburg / DE | 03 /
SOKOLIHS, Dirk Waldweg 10 49565 Bramsche / DE | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/03] | Application number, filing date | 10715668.9 | 11.03.2010 | WO2010DE50009 | Priority number, date | DE20091001535 | 13.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009001535 | [2012/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010102617 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2406121 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2406121 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/20, B62D17/00, B60G7/00, B25B13/02, B25B13/48, B25B13/50 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
B25B13/02 (EP,KR,US);
B25B13/48 (EP,US);
B25B13/50 (EP,US);
B60G7/00 (KR);
B62D17/00 (EP,KR,US);
B62D7/20 (EP,KR,US);
F16B7/18 (KR);
Y10T29/49948 (EP,US);
Y10T403/29 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/03] | B62D7/20, B62D17/00, B60G7/00, B25B13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPURSTANGE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [2014/41] | English: | TIE ROD FOR MOTOR VEHICLES | [2014/41] | French: | BARRE D'ACCOUPLEMENT POUR VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [2014/41] |
Former [2012/03] | BAUEINHEIT, VERFAHREN ZUR ANWENDUNG DIESER BAUEINHEIT UND WERKZEUG ZUR ANWENDUNG DES VERFAHRENS | ||
Former [2012/03] | ASSEMBLY, METHOD FOR APPLYING SAID ASSEMBLY, AND TOOL FOR APPLYING THE METHOD | ||
Former [2012/03] | UNITÉ DE CONSTRUCTION, PROCÉDÉ PAR L'APPLICATION DE CETTE UNITÉ DE CONSTRUCTION, ET OUTIL POUR L'APPLICATION DU PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 24.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2010 | BG | 22.04.2015 | CY | 22.04.2015 | CZ | 22.04.2015 | DK | 22.04.2015 | EE | 22.04.2015 | ES | 22.04.2015 | FI | 22.04.2015 | HR | 22.04.2015 | IT | 22.04.2015 | LT | 22.04.2015 | LV | 22.04.2015 | MC | 22.04.2015 | MK | 22.04.2015 | MT | 22.04.2015 | NL | 22.04.2015 | PL | 22.04.2015 | RO | 22.04.2015 | SE | 22.04.2015 | SI | 22.04.2015 | SK | 22.04.2015 | SM | 22.04.2015 | TR | 22.04.2015 | NO | 22.07.2015 | GR | 23.07.2015 | IS | 22.08.2015 | PT | 24.08.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 11.03.2010 | |
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MK | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
SM | 22.04.2015 | ||
TR | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.03.2010 | |
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MK | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
SM | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 22.04.2015 | |
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 22.04.2015 | |
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 22.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [IA]WO2008027476 (KIELCZEWSKI GRZEGORZ [US], et al) [I] 1-5,7-10,13,17 * paragraphs [0013] - [0021] * * figure - * [A] 6,11,12,14-16,18-38; | [XI]US6131494 (QUENNEVILLE JAMES T [US]) [X] 18,37 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 36 * * figure - * [I] 19,38; | [XI]GB1146315 (BROADS MFG COMPANY LTD) [X] 19,38 * the whole document * [I] 18,37; | [AD]DE19900264 (LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG [DE]) [AD] 1-17,20-36 * column 1, lines 1-53 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 22 * * figure - *; | [A]US6902342 (DITZLER STEVEN JAY [US]) [A] 1-10,13,17,20-30,33,36 * column 2, lines 10-60 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4198174 (BOROWIEC RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1,11-13,17,20,31-33,36 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 41 * * column 3, line 11 - column 5, line 2 * * figure - * | by applicant | DE19900264 | DE7732250U |