Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8911803 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2014 | B2 | US2012021078 | 26.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 | WO2010EP55431 | 23.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105326056 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 | CN201080018316 | 23.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102413718 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 | WO2010EP55431 | 23.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010243691B | Global Dossier | 15.01.2015 | B9 | AU2010243691B | 04.12.2014 | B2 | AU2010243691 | 27.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 | WO2010EP55431 | 23.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2424385 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2014 | B1 | EP2424385 | 07.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10715818 | 23.04.2010 | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 | WO2010EP55431 | 23.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI1015300 | 17.12.2019 | B1 | BRPI1015300 | 12.07.2016 | A8 | BRPI1015300 | 25.08.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 | WO2010EP55431 | 23.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2757511 | 04.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 | WO2010EP55431 | 23.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2531412T | 13.03.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 | WO2010EP55431 | 23.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2011011015 | 02.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 | WO2010EP55431 | 23.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2424385T | 29.05.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP10715818 | 23.04.2010 | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 | WO2010EP55431 | 23.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2536916 | 27.12.2014 | C2 | RU2011148137 | 10.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 | WO2010EP55431 | 23.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG174908 | 28.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 | WO2010EP55431 | 23.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010124997 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2011002719 | 22.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY159773 | 31.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2424385E | 20.02.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201043153 | 16.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09158980 | 28.04.2009 |